Washington Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-05073
Case Filed:Mar 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Mar 22, 2024 12:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Alan Bojorquez (2)
Represented By
Sean M Downs
Grecco Downs PLLC
contact info
Paula Tuckfield Olson
Law Office Of Paula T. Olson
contact info
Defendant
Jesus Sandoval-Hernandez (1)
Represented By
Elizabeth Sher
Federal Public Defender'S Office (tac)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Elyne Maraa Vaught
United States Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/22/2024 1:46 AM PDT
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
Arrest of Jesus Sandoval-Hernandez and Alan Bojorquez on 3/19/2024 pursuant to probable cause. (KAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER appointing Elizabeth Sher for Jesus Sandoval-Hernandez. On the basis of the defendant's sworn financial statement, the court finds that they are financially unable to retain counsel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender for the Western District of Washington be and hereby is appointed to represent the defendant pursuant to Title 18 United States Code 3006A. Approved by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. (No.pdf image attached) (KAM)
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 20 Appointment as to Alan Bojorquez (No.pdf image attached): Appointment of Attorney Paula Tuckfield Olson for Alan Bojorquez, Approved by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. (KAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Detention Order by USA as to Jesus Sandoval-Hernandez. (KAM)
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Detention Order by USA as to Alan Bojorquez. (KAM)
Related: [-]
7 7 COMPLAINT as to Jesus Sandoval-Hernandez and Alan Bojorquez; signed in open court. (KAM)
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold- CRD: K Miller ; AUSA: Elyne Vaught ; Def Cnsl: FPD Liz Sher (for Jesus Sandoval-Hernandez -01) and CJA Paula Olson (for Alan Bojorquez -02) ; PTS: Samantha Kerwin ; Time of Hearing: 2:00 PM ; Courtroom: F ; Session #: TAC240319 ; Interpreter: Jason Schrier (previously sworn) ; Language: Spanish ; INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Jesus Sandoval-Hernandez, Alan Bojorquez held on 3/19/2024. Defendants arrested on probable cause. DEA Agent Jesse Hotz sworn; Complaint signed in open court. Defendants advised of rights and the charge. Defendants remanded to custody. Dft -01 - Detention Hearing set for 3/22/2024 at 01:30 PM in D Courtroom before Judge David W. Christel. Dft -02 - Detention Hearing set for 3/25/2024 at 03:00 PM in F Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. Preliminary Examination set for 4/2/2024 at 03:00 PM in F Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. (KAM)
Related: [-]
9 9 The Court Orders as follows: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, counsel for the government is reminded of his/her obligations pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny to disclose exculpatory material and information, as required by applicable statute and case law. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. By Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. (No.pdf image attached) (KAM)
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF RIGHTS AT INITIAL APPEARANCE by Jesus Sandoval-Hernandez. (KAM)
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 20 Appointment as to Alan Bojorquez: Appointment of Attorney Sean M Downs for Alan Bojorquez Approved by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. (KAM)
Related: [-]