Montgomery v. Reed et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Irene C Berger |
Referred: | Omar J Aboulhosn |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00149 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 2:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Judge George Hill
|
|
Plaintiff
John Paul Montgomery
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response In Support
Mon 04/15 3:07 PM
ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION/EXHIBIT by John Paul Montgomery in support of12 Second Amended Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (ts) |
|
16 | 16
respm
Response In Support
Mon 04/15 3:05 PM
ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by John Paul Montgomery in support of12 Second Amended Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (ts) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response In Support
Wed 04/10 1:12 PM
ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by John Paul Montgomery in support of12 Second Amended Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (lca) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Response In Support
Wed 04/10 1:10 PM
ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by John Paul Montgomery in support of12 Second Amended Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (lca) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Response In Support
Wed 04/10 1:09 PM
ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by John Paul Montgomery in support of12 Second Amended Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (lca) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
Complaint - Amended
Wed 04/10 1:06 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by John Paul Montgomery against Robert Childers, Scott Durig, George Hill, Karol Payne, Marcia Radabaugh, Linda Reed. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (lca) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Mon 04/08 2:44 PM
LETTER to Clerk of Court/Judge Goodwin, from David Ingram dated 4/4/2024, re: mail issues. (lca) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/08 2:33 PM
ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by John Paul Montgomery re:5 Amended Complaint. (lca) |
|
misc
Notice Of Docket Correction
Tue 04/09 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 11 Letter. ERROR: Image filed in incorrect case. CORRECTION: Image removed and filed in correct case. (lca) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/05 3:00 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint by 5/6/2024 naming "persons" as defendants and stating specific facts as to how each defendant violated his constitutional rights. Plaintiff is again NOTIFIED that it will be insufficient for him to simply refer to his prior2 Complaint or5 Amended Complaint,6 ,7 ,8 additional documentation, or to incorporate the same by reference in the Second Amended Complaint. The Second Amended Complaint will supersede the original2 Complaint and5 Amended Complaint. There must be one integrated document that will provide the defendants with notice of the claims and allegations against them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 4/5/2024. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se w/form Complaint) (arb) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/04 1:50 PM
ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by John Paul Montgomery in support of5 Amended Complaint. (kew) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 5 Envelope | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/04 1:33 PM
ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by John Paul Montgomery in support of5 Amended Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kew) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/04 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF DEMAND by John Paul Montgomery. (kew) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint - Amended
Mon 04/01 3:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT by John Paul Montgomery against Robert Childers, Scott Durig, George Hill, Karol Payne, Marcia Radabaugh, Linda Reed and REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel. (ts) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments 1-10, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/27 11:37 AM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to amend his Complaint by 4/29/2024; the Clerk is directed to mail a form Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/27/2024. (cc: Plaintiff) (kew) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Judge Berger Administrative Order
Tue 03/26 10:02 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Proposed Findings & Recommendations. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # 2002324. (kew) |
|
Att: 1 Attachments, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Receipt, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment Of Fees Or Costs
Mon 03/25 4:26 PM
APPLICATION by John Paul Montgomery to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (kew) |
|
utility
Case Assigned
Tue 03/26 10:01 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) |