Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-40743

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nancy Hershey Lord
Case #: 1:24-ap-01042
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Terminated:Jan 14, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
U.S. Department Of Education
Represented By
U.S. Department Of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Adams Sissoko
12365 147th Street Apt. A112
Jamaica, NY 11436
Represented By
Adams Sissoko
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/14 9:04 AM
Adversary Case 1:24-ap-1042 Closed (dnb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned AP) Fri 11/15 4:35 PM
Hearing Held; No Appearance either sied; Stipulation entered; Pre-Trial Marked Off. Related [+](AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, October 04, 2024
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Fri 10/04 4:23 PM
Stipulation and Order of Dischargeability by and between Plaintiff-Debtor and Defendant. All of Plaintiff-Debtors educational loan debt owed to the Department of Education, which totaled approximately Three Thousand Forty-Eight Dollars and Forty-Five Cents ($3,048.45) as of March 25, 2024, is dischargeable pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 523(a)(8) on the ground that repayment would impose an undue hardship on the Plaintiff-Debtor Related [+]. Signed on 10/4/2024 (one)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Approve Stipulation filed by Defendant U.S. Department Of Education
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
12 12 motion Approve Stipulation Wed 09/25 10:15 PM
Motion to Approve Stipulation Filed by Marika Maris Lyons on behalf of U.S. Department Of Education. (Lyons, Marika)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Thu 09/12 10:54 AM
Hearing Held; Appearances: Marika Maris Lyons (Counsel to Defendant), Adams Sissoko (Plaintiff); Stipulation to be Submitted; Adjourned as a Holding Date to 11/07/2024 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, September 05, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice to Creditors Fri 09/06 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice to Creditors Notice Date 09/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
10 10 court Blank Creditor Notice (Select Specific Creditors to Notice) Tue 09/03 8:41 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference by the Court from 9/11/2024 at 2:30 P.M. to 9/12/2024 at 10:00 A.M. Re: Related [+] (agh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Adams Sissoko
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Wed 08/28 5:16 PM
Pre-Trial Rescheduled by the Court to 09/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY Related [+] (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 08/07 11:33 AM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held; Appearances: Marika Maris Lyons (Counsel to Defendant), Adams Sissoko (Plaintiff); and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/11/2024 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (AngelaHoward)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Thursday, June 20, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 06/21 3:08 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held; Appearances: Marika Maris Lyons (Counsel to US Department of Education) , Adams Sissoko (Debtor/Plaintiff); and Adjourned; Adjourned hearing to be held on 08/07/2024 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. Related [+] (drk)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, June 14, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice to Creditors Sun 06/16 12:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice to Creditors Notice Date 06/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
8 8 court Blank Creditor Notice (Select Specific Creditors to Notice) Wed 06/12 4:03 PM
Notice of Updated Hearing Location Re: Related [+] (agh)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, June 07, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Fri 06/07 3:09 PM
Letter Filed by Marika Maris Lyons on behalf of U.S. Department Of Education (Lyons, Marika)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 06/07 3:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Marika Maris Lyons on behalf of U.S. Department Of Education (Lyons, Marika)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Thu 03/28 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 03/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/26 1:53 PM
Summons Served on U.S. Department Of Education, US Attorney, Eastern District Of New York, U.S Trustee, US Trustee Office Of the United States, Trustee Gregory Messer PLLC 3/25/2024 . (las)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
3 3 court Court's Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/25 4:26 PM
Court's Service Lis Related [+] (nwh)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Mon 03/25 4:15 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against U.S. Department Of Education Answer Due: 4/24/2024 Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3577 (Judge Lord), Brooklyn, NY. (nwh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/25 3:55 PM
Adversary case 1 24-01042 Complaint by Adams Sissoko against U.S. Department Of Education. Receipt Number WAIVED, Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)). (nwh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet