California Southern District Court
Judge:Dana M Sabraw
Referred: Valerie E Torres
Case #: 3:24-cv-00569
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332pl Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Terminated:Aug 30, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 3:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Lenny & Larry's, LLC
Represented By
Norman Michael Aspis
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Samuel Garcia
Represented By
Michael David Braun
Kuzyk Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Samantha Kotcher
Represented By
Michael David Braun
Kuzyk Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 30, 2024
17 17 minutes ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 08/30 3:27 PM
Minute Order Vacating Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). In light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No.16 ), the Court VACATES the SDC set for September 16, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on August 30, 2024. (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/29 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Samuel Garcia, Samantha Kotcher (Braun, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
15 15 minutes ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/19 5:27 PM
Minute Order Setting Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC"). In light of the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement (Doc. No.14 ), the Court SETS a telephonic SDC for September 16, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Teleconference information will be sent out two days prior to the SDC. As Defendant has not answered, only Plaintiffs' counsel is required to appear. Counsel for Defendant may appear. The Court will automatically vacate the SDC if Plaintiff files a notice or joint motion to dismiss prior to the SDC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on July 19, 2024. (no document attached) (cxy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 07/18 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Lenny & Larry's, LLC(Aspis, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/18 3:51 PM
ORDER Granting12 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/18/2024. (rxc)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 06/18 1:21 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Lenny & Larry's, LLC.(Aspis, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, May 31, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 05/31 12:39 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Extend Time For Defendant To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint10 . Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/31/2024. (ddf)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Fri 05/31 9:26 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Lenny & Larry's, LLC.(Aspis, Norman) (ddf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, May 13, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/13 3:26 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Extend Defendant's Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint8 . Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/13/2024. (ddf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/10 5:35 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Lenny & Larry's, LLC.(Aspis, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/17 2:01 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion To Extend Defendant's Time To Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint4 . Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/17/2024. (ddf)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Wed 04/17 11:45 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Lenny & Larry's, LLC . Identifying Other Affiliate Happy Cat Holdings, LLC for Lenny & Larry's, LLC.(Aspis, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/17 11:41 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lenny & Larry's, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties.(Aspis, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/17 11:22 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Lenny & Larry's, LLC.(Aspis, Norman)Attorney Norman Michael Aspis added to party Lenny & Larry's, LLC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Monday, April 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/08 10:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Garcia, Samantha Kotcher. Lenny & Larry's, LLC served. (Braun, Michael) (ddf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 03/26 10:37 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (stn) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/26 10:34 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Lenny & Larry's, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18703051.), filed by Samuel Garcia, Samantha Kotcher. The new case number is 3:24-cv-569-DMS-VET. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case. (Michael Braun)(stn) (jmo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet