Brown v. Jividen
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Frank W Volk |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00152 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum In Support
Wed 04/24 4:12 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Jeff S. Sandy in support of12 MOTION by Jeff S. Sandy to Dismiss With Prejudice re:1 Complaint (Parsons, Colton) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/24 1:55 PM
MOTION by Jeff S. Sandy to Dismiss With Prejudice re:1 Complaint. (Parsons, Colton). (Modified on 4/24/2024 to remove memorandum in support) (mk) |
|
misc
Notice Of Docket Correction
Wed 04/24 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:12 Motion by Jeff S. Sandy to Dismiss With Prejudice re:1 Complaint. ERROR: Memorandum of Law attached to Motion. CORRECTION: Memorandum of Law removed; counsel refiled separately; image replaced. (mk) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
20
pgs
respm
Memorandum In Support
Thu 04/18 1:41 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Betsy Jividen in support of10 MOTION by Betsy Jividen to Dismiss With Prejudice, re:1 Complaint. (Shuman, David) (Modified on 4/18/2024 to add link to #10 motion) (mkw) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss
Thu 04/18 1:38 PM
MOTION by Betsy Jividen to Dismiss With Prejudice, re:1 Complaint. (Shuman, David) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice Of Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/18 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D. Mullins, Colton C. Parsons on behalf of Jeff S. Sandy. (Mullins, Michael) (Modified on 4/18/2024 to add the name of additional counsel) (mkw) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed By Personal Service
Thu 04/11 1:18 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/Affidavit of Process Server for service re:2 Summons upon Michael Francis re:1 Complaint. Michael Francis served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. Summons served on Michael Francis. (New, Stephen) (Modified on 4/11/2024 to add links to #2 summons and #1 complaint) (mk) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed By Personal Service
Thu 04/11 1:17 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/Affidavit of Process Server for service re:2 Summons upon Larry Warden re:1 Complaint. Larry Warden served on 4/10/2024, answer due 5/1/2024. Summons served on Larry Warden. (New, Stephen) (Modified on 4/11/2024 to add links to #2 summons and #1 complaint (mk). |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed By Personal Service
Wed 04/10 12:01 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/Affidavit of Process Server for service re:2 Summons upon Brad Douglas re:1 Complaint. Brad Douglas served on 4/9/2024, answer due 4/30/2024. Summons served on Brad Douglas. (New, Stephen) (Modified on 4/10/2024 to add links to #2 summons and #1 complaint) (mk) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed By Personal Service
Wed 04/10 12:00 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED/Affidavit of Process Server for service re:2 Summons upon Jeff S. Sandy re:1 Complaint. Jeff S. Sandy served on 4/3/2024, answer due 4/24/2024. Summons served on Jeff Sandy. (New, Stephen) (Modified on 4/10/2024 to add links to #2 summons and #1 complaint) (mk) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed By Personal Service
Wed 04/10 11:57 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for service re:2 Summons upon Betsy Jividen re:1 Complaint. Betsy Jividen served on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024. Summons served on Betsy Jividen. (New, Stephen) (Modified on 4/10/2024 to add links to #2 summons and #1 complaint) (mk) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Tue 03/26 7:51 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (mk) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 03/26 7:47 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Betsy Jividen, West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Michael Francis, Larry Warden, Brad Douglas, Jeff S. Sandy re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mk) |
|
Att: 1 Summons as to West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, | ||
Att: 2 Summons as to Michael Francis, | ||
Att: 3 Summons as to Larry Warden, | ||
Att: 4 Summons as to Brad Douglas, | ||
Att: 5 Summons as to Jeff S. Sandy | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 5:53 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8620342. (mk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons as to Betsy Jividen, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons as to West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons as to Michael Francis, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons as to Larry Warden, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons as to Brad Douglas, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons as to Jeff S. Sandy, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons as to John/Jane Doe Correctional Officers | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Wed 03/27 9:06 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc) |