New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joanna Seybert
Case #: 2:24-cv-02348
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 6:04 AM EDT
Defendant
The City of New York
Represented By
Steven Ernest Smith
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Eric Adams
Represented By
Steven Ernest Smith
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
Represented By
Steven Ernest Smith
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
David Banks
Represented By
Steven Ernest Smith
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Helene Moffatt
1124 31st Ave. Apt. 9A
Astoria, NY 11106
Represented By
Ronald A. Berutti
Murray-Nolan Berutti LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Anastasia Coleman
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Represented By
Steven Ernest Smith
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Daniel Weisberg
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Defendant
Elizabeth Vladeck
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Defendant
Karen Stone
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Defendant
Karen Solimando
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Defendant
Rosemary Sinclair
Terminated: 08/29/2024
479 Rugby Rd.
Brooklyn, NY 11226
Represented By
Dina Kolker
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Henry Rubio
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Represented By
Dina Kolker
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Juan Rosales
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Defendant
Kathy Rodi
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Defendant
David Grandwetter
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Represented By
Dina Kolker
Steptoe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Council of School Supervisors & Administrators
Terminated: 08/29/2024
1300 Veterans Highway Suite 330
Hauppauge, NY 11788
Represented By
Dina Kolker
Steptoe LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/25 10:25 AM
Re-set hearing as to30 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Amended Complaint . The Court is adjourning the motion hearing scheduled for April 29th to 3:00 p.m. on June 18, 2025 by phone. This is the next available date on the Court's calendar. All parties shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/25/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 04/11 10:37 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part43 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Court will be unavailable to preside over conferences during the month of May. Accordingly, the motion hearing scheduled for April 17th will instead be held at 10:30 a.m. on April 29th. Counsel shall use the same dial-in number previously provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/11/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Fri 04/11 11:53 AM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Docket entry re: April 18th conference deleted. Entered under incorrect case. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
43 43 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 04/10 12:09 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for April 17, 2025 by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 04/09 2:10 PM
ORDER denying42 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Plaintiff failed to gain Defendants' consent. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to refer to this Court's Individual Rules when seeking relief of the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/9/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
42 42 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 04/08 11:19 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for April 17, 2025 by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/03 1:24 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on30 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. A motion hearing will be held at 12:30 p.m. on April 17, 2025 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 4/3/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/31 7:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re30 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Amended Complaint filed by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 03/27 11:40 AM
ORDER granting40 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff shall file the reply to the opposition to the motion to amend by March 31st. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 3/27/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
40 40 motion Leave to File Document Tue 03/25 12:22 PM
Letter MOTION for Leave to File Document seeking extension of time to file Reply by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
39 39 motion Stay Fri 01/10 3:48 PM
Second MOTION to Stay to Accommodate Counsel's Medical Leave by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 01/10 3:03 PM
ORDER denying38 Motion to Stay. Applications not submitted on consent of all parties will not be granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/10/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 01/10 7:02 PM
ORDER granting39 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff shall file the reply to the opposition to the motion to amend by March 24th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/10/2025. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
38 38 motion Stay Thu 01/09 12:37 PM
MOTION to Stay for 60 Day Medical Leave by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
37 37 19 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Wed 01/08 5:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re30 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Amended Complaint filed by New York City Department of Education, Eric Adams, The City of New York, David Banks. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/08 5:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re30 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Amended Complaint filed by New York City Department of Education, Eric Adams, The City of New York, David Banks. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Plaintiff's Right to Sue Letter
Friday, December 06, 2024
35 35 misc Letter Fri 12/06 10:29 AM
Letter to Judge Tiscione by Helene Moffatt (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Letter Fri 12/06 10:27 AM
Letter re: Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule by New York City Department of Education, Eric Adams, The City of New York, David Banks (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Fri 12/06 9:45 AM
ORDER re Order. Counsel failed to comply with this Court's Order of 12/5/2025 and failed to appear in Courtroom 910 at 9:00 a.m. this morning as directed. Accordingly, counsel shall file the joint letter by 10:30 a.m. today or an in-person Show Cause Hearing will be scheduled for 9:00 a.m. on December 9, 2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/6/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/06 11:44 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Court is satisfied with Counsels' representation that an amicable resolution to the briefing schedule disagreement has been reached. Accordingly, Municipal Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend by January 8, 2025 and Plaintiff shall file a reply by January 22, 2025. Once the motion is fully briefed, the Court will hold a hearing on the motion if necessary. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/6/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
order Order(Other) Thu 12/05 7:58 AM
ORDER re32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to30 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Amended Complaint filed by The City of New York, Eric Adams, David Banks, New York City Department of Education,33 Response to Motion filed by Helene Moffatt. Plaintiff filed a motion to amend the complaint on November 14, 2024. This Court directed Defendants to file their opposition by December 3rd. By application dated December 2, 2024, docket entry 32 , Defendants sought a brief extension of time to respond to which Plaintiff refused to consent. Defendants counsel proceeded to contact chambers by phone on two occasions, inquiring when the Court would rule on the application. The Court directed Plaintiff to file a letter explaining the reasoning behind the refusal to give consent to Defendants' extension request, to which Plaintiff promptly filed a letter stating their "frank and truthful reason for denying the request, which is that he previously had refused to provide this office with a standard courtesy". Accordingly, by close of business today, counsel shall confer in a professional manner with each other in an attempt to agree additional time for Defendant's response and file a letter to that effect. If counsel find that they cannot achieve this simple task, counsel for both parties must appear before this Court in Courtroom 910 of the Central Islip Courthouse at 9:00 a.m. on December 6, 2024 to discuss with the Court what appears to be continued acrimony between counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/5/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
33 33 respm Response to Motion Wed 12/04 2:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to30 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 12/04 2:22 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall file a letter with the Court no later than December 6th explaining the reasoning behind refusing to consent to Defendants' extension application. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/4/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/02 2:33 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to30 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Amended Complaint by New York City Department of Education, Eric Adams, The City of New York, David Banks. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
31 31 minutes Telephone Conference Thu 11/21 4:51 PM
Minute Entry for Telephone Conference held on 11/21/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Berutti for Plaintiff; Smith for Defendants. Defendants shall file their opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend by December 3, 2024. Plaintiff shall file the Reply by December 18, 2024. Once the motion is fully briefed, the Court will hold a hearing on the motion if necessary. (Not Recorded.) (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
30 30 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Thu 11/14 4:46 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Amended Complaint by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit B
order Scheduling Order Thu 11/14 9:15 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephone conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. on November 21, 2024 before the undersigned. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 11/14/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
29 29 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Thu 10/17 6:39 PM
Minute Order for Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Berutti for Plaintiff; Smith for Defendants. Plaintiff's Second MOTION to Amend the Complaint27 is denied because a copy of the proposed amended complaint was not attached to the motion. Plaintiff is directed to provide a copy of the proposed amended complaint to Defendants and either file a letter motion on consent (attaching a copy of the proposed second amended complaint), or a formal motion to amend if Defendants will be opposing the proposed amendment. Parties will confer and advise the Court if a new briefing schedule should be set now on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss or if the parties agree to hold off on briefing the motion to dismiss until after any new parties added by the second amended complaint join the case. (Cisco (10:30 - 10:45).) (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Fri 10/11 4:39 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on27 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. A motion hearing will be held at 10:30 a.m. on October 16, 2024 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 10/11/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
28 28 misc Letter Wed 10/09 3:51 PM
Letter Requesting Clarification on Plaintiff's Request to File a Second Amended Complaint by Eric Adams, David Banks, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 21, 2024
27 27 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Sat 09/21 4:44 PM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement22 Amended Complaint,26 Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend,, Motion Hearing, by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
26 26 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Fri 09/13 5:22 PM
Minute Order for Motion Hearing held on 9/13/2024 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Berutti for Plaintiff; Smith for Defendants. First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend25 is granted. Defendants' Letter Motion for pre-motion conference20 is denied as moot. Defendant's shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by October 14, 2024. (Not Recorded.) (LV)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Amend Thu 09/05 2:03 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend22 Amended Complaint,20 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Renewing Municipal Defendants' July 17, 2024 Pre-Motion Letter, ECF No. 16 by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Parties Thu 09/05 10:45 AM
Order Dismissing Parties Re:23 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to CSA Defendants. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/5/2024. (CV)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Thu 09/05 3:12 PM
ORDER deferring ruling on25 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend22 Amended Complaint,20 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Renewing Municipal Defendants' July 17, 2024 Pre-Motion Letter, ECF No. 16 . A motion hearing will be held at 3:00 p.m. on September 13, 2024 before the undersigned by phone. Counsel for all parties must participate and shall connect to the conference through dial-in number 571-353-2301 with ID# 179933855. THE PARTIES ARE REMINDED that audio or video recording of proceedings by any party other than the Court, is strictly prohibited by Local Civil Rule 1.8. Violation of this rule may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed appropriate by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 9/5/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 09/04 6:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the CSA Defendants, only, by Helene Moffatt (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Wed 09/04 10:15 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (the "Extension Motion") (ECF No.19 ): Plaintiff's Extension Motion is denied without prejudice to renew before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Tiscione . Notwithstanding this Court, inter alia , setting a date by which Plaintiff was to file her amended complaint, which deadline was set in the context of ruling upon pre-motion conference letters ( see JS July 25, 2025 Elec. Order), in accordance with the undersigned's Individual Rules I(F)(3) and 3(H)(1), requests for extensions of time to serve, answer, or file amended pleadings shall be addressed to the assigned magistrate judge. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 9/4/2024. (AME)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/29 4:45 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eric Adams, David Banks, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York, filed by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Letter Thu 08/29 4:27 PM
Letter by Council of School Supervisors & Administrators, David Grandwetter, Henry Rubio, Rosemary Sinclair (Kolker, Dina)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 08/29 12:41 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference Renewing Municipal Defendants' July 17, 2024 Pre-Motion Letter, ECF No. 16 by Eric Adams, David Banks, Anastasia Coleman, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to Amend Thu 08/22 11:26 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 07/25 10:09 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER regarding18 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; and14 and16 Motions for a Pre-Motion Conference. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' respective Motions for a Pre-Motion Conference seeking leave to file Motions to Dismiss (collectively, the "PMC Motions"), (ECF Nos.14 ,16 ); and Plaintiff's subsequent Request for Leave to File an Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure ("Rule") 15(a)(1)(B) ("Plaintiff's Motion"). In accordance with Rule 15(a)(1)(B), and in the interest of proceeding in the most efficient manner, Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly: (1) Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by August 15, 2024 ; (2) Defendants shall amend or renew their PMC Motions, or otherwise respond to the amended complaint, by August 29, 2024 . Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 7/25/2024. (AME)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
18 18 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/24 2:46 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Document pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Affidavit/Affirmation Wed 07/24 1:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION by Helene Moffatt (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 2 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service,
Att: 5 Affidavit of Service
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
16 16 motion Pre Motion Conference Wed 07/17 6:53 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to seek leave to move to dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Eric Adams, David Banks, Anastasia Coleman, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/17 6:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Ernest Smith on behalf of Eric Adams, David Banks, Anastasia Coleman, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Wed 07/17 11:15 AM
Letter by Council of School Supervisors & Administrators, David Grandwetter, Henry Rubio, Rosemary Sinclair (Kolker, Dina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
order Order on Motion to Reassign Case Thu 07/11 3:46 PM
ORDER terminating13 Motion to Reassign Case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/11/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/10 8:49 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - Declined Tue 07/09 5:26 PM
NOTICE to Assign District Judge: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to a district judge. (LV)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
13 13 motion Reassign Case Mon 07/08 6:21 PM
Letter MOTION to Reassign Case to a District Judge for Purposes of Making a Rule 12 Motion by Eric Adams, David Banks, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Mon 07/08 5:57 PM
Letter by Council of School Supervisors & Administrators, David Grandwetter, Henry Rubio, Rosemary Sinclair (Kolker, Dina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/02 12:48 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise Respond to1 Complaint, by Council of School Supervisors & Administrators, David Grandwetter, Henry Rubio, Rosemary Sinclair. (Kolker, Dina) Modified on 5/2/2024 (LV)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/02 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dina Kolker on behalf of Council of School Supervisors & Administrators, David Grandwetter, Henry Rubio, Rosemary Sinclair (aty to be noticed) (Kolker, Dina)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 05/02 3:02 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, Council of School Supervisors & Administrators answer due 7/8/2024; David Grandwetter answer due 7/8/2024; Henry Rubio answer due 7/8/2024; Rosemary Sinclair answer due 7/8/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/2/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/01 11:36 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Eric Adams, David Banks, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York. (Smith, Steven) Modified on 5/1/2024 (LV)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/01 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Ernest Smith on behalf of Eric Adams, David Banks, New York City Department of Education, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Steven)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 05/01 1:17 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint Eric Adams answer due 7/8/2024; David Banks answer due 7/8/2024; New York City Department of Education answer due 7/8/2024; The City of New York answer due 7/8/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 5/1/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 04/12 2:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Eric Adams, David Banks, Anastasia Coleman, Council of School Supervisors & Administrators, David Grandwetter, New York City Department of Education, Kathy Rodi, Juan Rosales, Henry Rubio, Rosemary Sinclair, Karen Solimando, Karen Stone, The City of New York, Elizabeth Vladeck, Daniel Weisberg. (IL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/11 11:44 AM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Helene Moffatt (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 04/08 4:24 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CL)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 04/08 4:18 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (CL)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/08 4:20 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 04/08 4:26 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: No summons provided, please submit summons. The event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/05 11:52 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Helene Moffatt (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 04/05 11:47 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Helene Moffatt (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Thu 04/04 8:31 AM
NOTICE: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. A completed Civil Cover Sheet was not filed - specifically page 2 of the document is missing; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/03 11:02 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Helene Moffatt (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/03 10:59 AM
**THIRD NOTICE**: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/01 8:46 AM
***SECOND NOTICE***: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 1:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17721902 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Helene Moffatt. (Berutti, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Complaint
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/29 2:49 PM
Notice: Re: Civil Cover Sheet. A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (LJ)
Related: [-]