California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:24-cv-01951
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 2:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Basin Street Properties
Represented By
Anthony Joseph DeCristoforo
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Eric Fleet Della Santa
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak, & Stewart
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Bruno
Represented By
Julia C Parish
Legal Aid At Work
contact info
Shazzy Kamali
Legal Aid At Work
contact info
Katherine Mallak Wutchiett
Legal Aid At Work
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/27 4:40 PM
CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/24 9:26 AM
NOTICE by Sara Bruno of Pending Settlement (Kamali, Shazzy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/25 9:35 AM
NOTICE by Sara Bruno of Pending Settlement (Parish, Julia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
29 29 16 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 10/02 11:16 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for Standard Litigation signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 28 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
28 28 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 09/25 4:51 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Sara Bruno. (Kamali, Shazzy)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Order on Stipulation Wed 09/25 4:17 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: The parties' request for entry of their stipulated protective order 26 is denied, without prejudice, for failure to comply with Part VII.C of my civil standing order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (agtlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
26 26 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 09/24 3:03 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Sara Bruno. (Kamali, Shazzy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
25 25 order Order Wed 09/11 9:10 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: After the parties complete their mediation, they shall file a status report with the Court, by November 25, 2024. The Court will then determine what additional case deadlines need to be set. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (agtlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/10 4:16 PM
NOTICE by Sara Bruno OF MEDIATION (Kamali, Shazzy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
23 23 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Tue 08/20 9:28 AM
Minute Entry for initial case management conference held on 8/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. By no later than 9/6/2024, the parties shall meet and confer and agree on a mediator; then update the Court regarding the mediator and the mediation date. The Court shall issue a case management schedule after receiving the aforementioned update. Zoom Recording Time: 2:00 - 2:13. Plaintiff Attorneys: Shazzy Kamali, Julia Parish, and Katherine Wutchiett. Defendant Attorney: Eric F. Della Santa. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2024)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
22 22 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 08/09 1:15 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sara Bruno. (Kamali, Shazzy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/06 9:51 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (with jury demand) by Basin Street Properties. (Della Santa, Eric) Modified on 8/6/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 07/23 2:41 PM
ORDER on Motion to Dismiss by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/16 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR HEARING ON THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by Sara Bruno re17 Opposition/Response to Motion,11 MOTION to Dismiss. (Kamali, Shazzy) Modified on 7/16/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 07/05 11:35 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byBasin Street Properties. (Della Santa, Eric)
Related: [-] 11 MOTION to Dismiss
Friday, June 28, 2024
17 17 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 06/28 2:40 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed bySara Bruno.(Kamali, Shazzy)
Related: [-] 11 MOTION to Dismiss
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/26 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Joseph DeCristoforo (DeCristoforo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/20 9:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Mallak Wutchiett (Wutchiett, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/18 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel for Plaintiff by Sara Bruno. (Parish, Julia) Modified on 6/18/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 06/17 9:47 AM
CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 8/16/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/tse-alex-g-agt/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 06/14 3:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Sara Bruno (Parish, Julia)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Fri 06/14 1:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Basin Street Properties. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 7/26/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. Responses due by 6/28/2024. Replies due by 7/5/2024.(Della Santa, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Monday, June 10, 2024
10 10 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mon 06/10 3:06 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Della Santa, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
9 9 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Fri 06/07 10:45 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kamali, Shazzy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/23 3:13 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Basin Street Properties.. (Della Santa, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
7 7 service Request for Waiver of Service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 05/17 2:15 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to BASIN STREET PROPERTIES, a corporation on 04/17/2024 by Sara Bruno. , WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sara Bruno. Service waived by Basin Street Properties waiver sent on 4/17/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. Waiver of Service due by 5/17/2024.(Parish, Julia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Waiver
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/09 4:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sara Bruno.. (Parish, Julia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
5 5 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 04/01 9:32 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 04/01 9:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Basin Street Properties. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 03/29 3:39 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/12/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 03/29 12:03 PM
Proposed Summons. (Kamali, Shazzy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT for damages and injunctive relief against Basin Street Properties ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19272711.). Filed by Sara Bruno.(Kamali, Shazzy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet