Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:24-cv-00433
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Case in other court:Snohomish County Superior Court, 24-00002-02338-31
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 3:19 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Patricia Cole-Tindall
Represented By
Shane Patrick Cramer
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Erica R Iverson
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Randall Thor Thomsen
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Emily J Harris
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
City of Burien
Represented By
Daniel Andrew Brown
Williams Kastner And Gibbs (sea)
contact info
Sean D Leake
Williams Kastner And Gibbs (sea)
contact info
Sumeer Singla
Williams Kastner And Gibbs (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Patricia Cole-Tindall
Represented By
Shane Patrick Cramer
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Erica R Iverson
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Randall Thor Thomsen
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Emily J Harris
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Defendant
King County
Represented By
Shane Patrick Cramer
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Erica R Iverson
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Randall Thor Thomsen
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner Llp (sea)
contact info
Emily J Harris
Corr Cronin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Burien
Represented By
Daniel Andrew Brown
Williams Kastner And Gibbs (sea)
contact info
Sean D Leake
Williams Kastner And Gibbs (sea)
contact info
Sumeer Singla
Williams Kastner And Gibbs (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
29 29 order 1 - Order ~Util - Judgment Index - Add Record Mon 04/14 4:26 PM
ORDER re21 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees on Remand. The Court finds that Plaintiff's proposed fees are reasonable and orders that Defendants pay these costs. Plaintiff is AWARDED $26,986.50 in attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
28 28 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/27 9:50 AM
RESPONSE, by All Defendants, to21 MOTION for Attorney Fees On Remand . (Harris, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
27 27 misc Brief Thu 03/20 3:40 PM
BRIEF re26 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff City of Burien (Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
26 26 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Thu 03/13 4:50 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Attorney Fees On Remand. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (TE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
25 25 respm Declaration Thu 10/24 9:22 AM
DECLARATION of Daniel A. Brown filed by Plaintiff City of Burien re21 MOTION for Attorney Fees On Remand (Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/24 9:21 AM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Burien, TO RESPONSE to21 MOTION for Attorney Fees On Remand (Brown, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
23 23 respm Response to Motion Fri 10/18 2:38 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Patricia Cole-Tindall, King County, Counter Claimant Patricia Cole-Tindall, to21 MOTION for Attorney Fees On Remand .(Harris, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 17, 2024
22 22 misc Remand Letter Thu 10/17 12:30 PM
LETTER to Snohomish County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court. (KRA) (cc: letter, remand order, and docket sheet to Snohomish County Superior Court via USPS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
21 21 motion Attorney Fees Thu 10/03 4:18 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees On Remand , filed by Plaintiff City of Burien. Noting Date 10/24/2024, (Leake, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
20 20 7 pgs order Order to Remand Case Tue 09/24 4:46 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's14 Motion to Remand. The clerk shall remand this case to Snohomish County Superior Court. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 10/9/2024. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (SB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
19 19 respm Declaration Thu 05/09 12:03 PM
DECLARATION of Garmon Newsom II filed by Plaintiff City of Burien re14 MOTION to Remand (Singla, Sumeer)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 05/09 12:01 PM
REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Burien, TO RESPONSE to14 MOTION to Remand (Singla, Sumeer)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
17 17 respm Response to Motion Mon 05/06 2:14 PM
RESPONSE, by Defendants Patricia Cole-Tindall, King County, Counter Claimant Patricia Cole-Tindall, to14 MOTION to Remand . (Harris, Emily)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Counterclaim Fri 04/19 3:55 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re:1 Notice of Removal, Summons , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff City of Burien by Patricia Cole-Tindall.(Harris, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/18 12:49 PM
***Deadlines terminated. The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to VACATE the deadlines contained in the13 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT pending the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's14 MOTION to Remand. (VE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
15 15 respm Declaration Wed 04/17 5:45 PM
DECLARATION of Sumeer Singla filed by Plaintiff City of Burien re14 MOTION to Remand (Singla, Sumeer)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Remand Wed 04/17 5:44 PM
MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff City of Burien. Noting Date 5/10/2024, (Singla, Sumeer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 order RAJ Joint Status Report Order (FORM) Wed 04/17 9:07 AM
ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/1/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/8/2024, Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2024, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc RAJ Standing Order (FORM) Wed 04/17 9:04 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 04/16 12:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: The above-entitled case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Richard A. Jones, United States District Judge. The caption for this case shall hereinafter be C24-433-RAJ. All scheduled dates will remain as set unless the parties are notified otherwise by Richard A. Jones. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
10 10 misc Verification of State Court Records Fri 04/12 8:50 AM
VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re2 Judge Assignment Letter Related [+] Attorney Verification of State Court Records by Defendant King County (Harris, Emily)
Related: [-] moval & Transfer cases only
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/10 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily J Harris on behalf of Defendant Patricia Cole-Tindall. (Harris, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/08 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily J Harris on behalf of Defendant King County. (Harris, Emily)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Mon 04/08 4:01 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Randall Thor Thomsen; Shane Patrick Cramer and Erica R Iverson for Defendant King County. (Harris, Emily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 04/04 3:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. (TF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Related Case Wed 04/03 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:24-cv-00325-RAJ, by All Defendants. (Cramer, Shane)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
4 4 misc Consent Letter & Form Mon 04/01 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 4/8/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 04/01 3:51 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 4/8/2024. (MIH)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Mon 04/01 3:48 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 04/01 3:47 PM
Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/29 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 24 2-02338 31; Related [+] filed by Patricia Cole-Tindall, King County.(Thomsen, Randall)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8411293
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet