Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Referred: Kathleen L Desoto
Case #: 6:24-cv-00026
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 3:59 AM MDT
Defendant
Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By
Charles Henry Carpenter
Carpenter Law Firm PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Katie Bakke
Represented By
Robert Farris-Olsen
Morrison, Sherwood, Wilson & Deola, Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Kris Bakke
Represented By
Robert Farris-Olsen
Morrison, Sherwood, Wilson & Deola, Pllp
contact info

GPO Jun 05 2024
Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Morris. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Judge DeSoto.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 6/5/2024. (APP)

Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
22 22 order Order Setting - MT Order Vacating - MT Tue 03/11 11:45 AM
TEXT Order Re-Setting Location of Settlement Conference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Settlement Conference will be held at the Mike Mansfield Federal Courthouse in Butte, Montana on 5/1/2025 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/11/2025. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/07 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Gee on behalf of Katie Bakke, Kris Bakke (Gee, Michael)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/07 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Farris-Olsen on behalf of Katie Bakke, Kris Bakke (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
19 19 3 pgs order Order Setting - MT Mon 02/03 12:02 PM
Order Setting: Settlement Conference set for 5/1/2025 at 09:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 2/3/2025. (KAH)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 02/03 11:56 AM
***Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on February 3, 2025. Settlement conference will be held on May 1, 2025. Further order to follow. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
18 18 order Order Setting - MT Thu 01/30 3:55 PM
TEXT Order Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 2/3/2025 at 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. The call-in number is as follows: 833-990-9400; Meeting ID:882927420. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/30/2025. (SLL)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 01/30 3:42 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John Johnston for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 1/30/2025. (SGN)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Settlement Conference - MT Thu 01/30 12:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Conference . Robert Farris-Olsen appearing for Plaintiffs Katie Bakke, Kris Bakke. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order - SDM Tue 07/09 3:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2025 at 01:30 PM in Helena, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 10/20/2025 at 09:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2024. Discovery due by 4/28/2025. Motions due by 6/13/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/29/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 7/9/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 07/09 11:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held via Zoom on 7/9/2024. Robert Farris-Olsen appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Charles Carpenter appeared on behalf of Defendant. Written order to follow. (Hearing held in Missoula) (SGN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
13 13 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Tue 07/02 5:50 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Carpenter, Charles)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT Tue 07/02 4:07 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Katie Bakke, Kris Bakke. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT Tue 07/02 3:52 PM
STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Katie Bakke, Kris Bakke. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Joint Discovery Plan - SDM Tue 07/02 3:51 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Katie Bakke, Kris Bakke. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Withholding Consent - MT Wed 06/05 2:26 PM
Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Morris. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Judge DeSoto.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 6/5/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
8 8 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Mon 06/03 11:50 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
7 7 notice Mailing of Consent - MT Mon 05/20 10:37 AM
Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/3/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
6 6 misc Notice of Interested Parties Fri 05/17 4:56 PM
Notice of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group, Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Carpenter, Charles)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/17 3:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Carpenter, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Thu 04/04 1:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons. Served on Registered Agent, Damion Marcum on 04/03/2024, filed by Kris Bakke, Katie Bakke. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC answer due date 4/24/2024. (Farris-Olsen, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
3 3 order Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT Mon 04/01 11:40 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/2/2024. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/2/2024. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/2/2024. Zoom Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2024 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 4/1/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 03/29 4:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (TAG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Fri 03/29 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, filed by Kris Bakke, Katie Bakke. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 03/29 4:12 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3236029 (TAG)
Related: [-]