District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Timothy J Kelly
Case #: 1:24-cv-00920
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause05:0701 Judicial Review of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Sep 26, 2024 6:00 AM EDT
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By
Rebecca Michelle Kopplin
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Faith Lowry
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS J. VILSACK
Represented By
Rebecca Michelle Kopplin
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Faith Lowry
contact info
Plaintiff
ANGELA PROVOST
Represented By
John Bernard Kenney
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Matthew A. Macdonald
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Paul J. Watford
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Robin S Crauthers
Wilson Sonsini
contact info
Tonia Klausner
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC
contact info
Luis Li
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Luke Anthony Liss
Wsgr
contact info
Mark Yohalem
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Constandinos Himonas
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Nora Ahmed
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Louisiana
contact info
Ariel C. Green Anaba
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Plaintiff
WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.
Represented By
John Bernard Kenney
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Matthew A. Macdonald
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Paul J. Watford
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.
contact info
Robin S Crauthers
Wilson Sonsini
contact info
Tonia Klausner
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC
contact info
Luis Li
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Luke Anthony Liss
Wsgr
contact info
Mark Yohalem
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Constandinos Himonas
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info
Nora Ahmed
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Louisiana
contact info
Ariel C. Green Anaba
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
49 49 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 03/11 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to THOMAS J. VILSACK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. Attorney Faith Lowry terminated. (Lowry, Faith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
48 48 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 03/04 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to THOMAS J. VILSACK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. Attorney Rebecca Michelle Kopplin terminated. (Kopplin, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
47 47 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra Snyder on behalf of All Defendants (Snyder, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
46 46 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 02/25 6:23 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR, ANGELA PROVOST. Attorney Paul J. Watford terminated. (Watford, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
45 45 respm Reply to opposition to motion Tue 02/04 3:08 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re40 Motion to Dismiss filed by THOMAS J. VILSACK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Kopplin, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
44 44 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/07 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Vaden on behalf of WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR, ANGELA PROVOST (Vaden, Alice)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 05, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sun 01/05 10:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alice "Cate" Vaden is hereby admitted pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/5/2025. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
43 43 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 01/03 11:17 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re40 Motion to Dismiss (Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Class Action Complaint) filed by WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR, ANGELA PROVOST.(Kenney, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
42 42 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/03 7:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alice "Cate" Vaden, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11388309. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR, ANGELA PROVOST.(Kenney, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 12/18 9:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'41 Consent Motion to Extend Deadlines. For the reasons set forth in Plaintiffs'41 Consent Motion, and because Defendants consent to the relief sought, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs'41 Consent Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendants' partial motion to dismiss by January 3, 2025, and that Defendants shall file their reply in support of the partial motion to dismiss by February 4, 2025. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/18/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
41 41 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/17 6:01 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to40 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Complaint by WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR, ANGELA PROVOST.(Kenney, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2024
40 40 motion Dismiss Thu 11/07 6:10 PM
Partial MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Complaint by THOMAS J. VILSACK, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(Lowry, Faith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Notice of Closure,
Att: 2 Exhibit B, Schlanger Decl.
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
39 39 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 10/30 4:34 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR, ANGELA PROVOST. Attorney Robin S Crauthers terminated. (Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 10/25 2:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants'38 Consent Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline. For the reasons set forth in Defendants'38 Consent Motion, and because Plaintiffs consent to the relief sought, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants'38 Consent Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the briefing schedule is AMENDED as follows: Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss by November 7, 2024; Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants' motion by December 20, 2024; and Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion by January 21, 2025. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/25/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 10/24 6:26 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK.(Lowry, Faith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 10/02 10:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the docket, the Court notes that Defendants'25 Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs'1 Complaint has been rendered moot because the Court granted the parties'29 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule to be Amended, which permitted Plaintiffs to file the36 Amended Complaint. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants'25 Partial Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/02/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/19 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nora Ahmed on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Ahmed, Nora)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
36 36 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/16 11:58 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR, ANGELA PROVOST.(Kenney, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint Redline
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
35 35 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/11 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tonia Klausner on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Klausner, Tonia)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/09 11:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tonia Ouellette Klausner is hereby admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/09/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
34 34 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/06 2:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tonia Ouellette Klausner, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-11140560. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/06 9:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nora Sam Ahmed is hereby admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/6/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/06 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Local Rule 83.2(e)(2) requires an attorney seeking pro hac vice admission to set forth in a declaration "a list of all bars to which the attorney has been admitted." Attorney Tonia Ouellette Klausner referenced an "Attached List" of bar admissions to federal courts, but no such list appears in the33 Motion or attachments. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the33 Motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/6/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
33 33 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/05 3:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tonia Ouellette Klausner, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11138367. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
32 32 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/05 3:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nora Sam Ahmed, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-11138339. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/27 12:39 AM
NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Consolidate Cases by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Kenney, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Wed 08/21 3:47 PM
ORDER granting the parties'29 Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/21/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 08/21 4:05 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 9/16/2024. Answer due by 10/28/2024, Dispositive Motion, if any, due by 10/28/2024. Response, if any, due by 12/16/2024 Reply, if any, due by 1/21/2025. (zkh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
29 29 motion Briefing Schedule Tue 08/20 4:21 PM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule to be Amended by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Kenney, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/20 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Bernard Kenney on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Kenney, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
27 27 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Tue 07/09 3:47 PM
RESPONSE re26 Notice of Related Case filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK. (Lowry, Faith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/02 10:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs'26 Notice of Related Case, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response, if any, to the26 Notice of Related Case by July 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/2/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Related Case Fri 06/28 8:17 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR. Case related to Case No. 1:23-cv-02292-LLA.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Conference
Monday, June 24, 2024
25 25 motion Dismiss Mon 06/24 11:41 PM
Partial MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK. (Lowry, Faith)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
order Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/31 10:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties'24 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: (1) Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the1 Complaint by June 24, 2024; (2) Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to any motion or amended complaint by August 23, 2024; (3) Defendants shall file their reply to any opposition or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by September 23, 2024. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' deadline pursuant to Local Rule 23.1(b) for filing a motion for class certification is suspended pending further order of the Court following an initial scheduling conference, and in any event shall be at least 60 days after the close of briefing on any motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/31/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
24 24 motion Briefing Schedule Thu 05/30 8:41 AM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Related Order by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK.(Lowry, Faith) Modified event on 5/30/2024 (znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/30 8:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Faith Lowry on behalf of All Defendants (Lowry, Faith)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/29 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Watford on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Watford, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/23 9:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney Paul J. Watford is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/23/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 04/23 9:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants'21 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to all allegations presented in Plaintiffs'1 Complaint shall be June 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/23/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/22 3:12 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,,, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK.(Kopplin, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/17 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Macdonald on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Macdonald, Matthew)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Errata Wed 04/17 5:13 PM
ERRATA with Tracking Information/Proof of Delivery by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR re17 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,,, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,,, Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney,,.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B USPS Tracking Results
notice Notice of Error Wed 04/17 7:41 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR regarding17 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney. The following error(s) need correction: Other- Please provide tracking information/proof of delivery. File with an Errata using the event Errata. (znmw)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/17 10:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney Matthew A. Macdonald is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/17/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/16 6:48 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Paul J. Watford, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10832352. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Tue 04/16 4:37 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 4/4/2024; THOMAS J. VILSACK served on 4/4/2024, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/9/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/5/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/4/2024.) (Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/15 7:59 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew A. Macdonald, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10829768. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew A. Macdonald for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 12, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/12 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Constandinos Himonas on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Himonas, Constandinos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/11 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Yohalem on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Yohalem, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/11 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel C. Green Anaba on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Green Anaba, Ariel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/10 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Anthony Liss on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Liss, Luke)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/10 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Li on behalf of ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (Li, Luis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/08 12:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney Ariel C. Green Anaba is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/8/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/08 12:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney Constandinos Himonas is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/8/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/08 12:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney Mark Yohalem is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/8/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/08 12:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney Luis Li is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/8/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/08 12:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney Luke Liss is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions.] Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/8/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 9:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Luke Liss, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10807017. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 8:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Luis Li, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10807011. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 8:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark Yohalem, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10807010. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Mark Yohalem,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/04 7:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Constandinos Himonas, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BDCDC-10806975. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Constandinos Himonas,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/02 6:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ariel C. Green Anaba, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10800645. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Ariel C. Green Anaba for Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Tue 04/02 9:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting2 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/2/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
5 5 order Standing Order Mon 04/01 5:56 PM
STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/1/2024. (lctjk3)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 04/01 11:09 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 04/01 11:07 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
3 3 motion Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Fri 03/29 11:52 PM
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 21,
Att: 21 Exhibit 22,
Att: 22 Exhibit 24,
Att: 23 Exhibit 25,
Att: 24 Exhibit 26,
Att: 25 Exhibit 27,
Att: 26 Exhibit 28,
Att: 27 Exhibit 29,
Att: 28 Exhibit 30,
Att: 29 Exhibit 31,
Att: 30 Exhibit 32,
Att: 31 Exhibit 33,
Att: 32 Exhibit 34,
Att: 33 Exhibit 35,
Att: 34 Exhibit 36,
Att: 35 Exhibit 37,
Att: 36 Exhibit 38,
Att: 37 Exhibit 39,
Att: 38 Exhibit 40,
Att: 39 Exhibit 41,
Att: 40 Exhibit 42,
Att: 41 Exhibit 43,
Att: 42 Exhibit 44,
Att: 43 Exhibit 45,
Att: 44 Exhibit 46,
Att: 45 Exhibit 47,
Att: 46 Exhibit 48,
Att: 47 Exhibit 49,
Att: 48 Exhibit 50,
Att: 49 Exhibit 51,
Att: 50 Exhibit 52,
Att: 51 Exhibit 53,
Att: 52 Exhibit 56,
Att: 53 Exhibit 57,
Att: 54 Exhibit 58,
Att: 55 Exhibit 59,
Att: 56 Exhibit 60,
Att: 57 Exhibit 61,
Att: 58 Exhibit 62,
Att: 59 Exhibit 63,
Att: 60 Exhibit 64,
Att: 61 Exhibit 65,
Att: 62 Exhibit 66,
Att: 63 Exhibit 67,
Att: 64 Exhibit 68,
Att: 65 Exhibit 69,
Att: 66 Exhibit 71,
Att: 67 Exhibit 72,
Att: 68 Exhibit 74
2 2 motion Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Fri 03/29 11:34 PM
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ANGELA PROVOST, WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Counsel/Party
1 1 116 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 03/29 11:26 PM
COMPLAINT (Class Action) against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, THOMAS J. VILSACK with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10792204) filed by WENCESLAUS PROVOST, JR, ANGELA PROVOST.(Crauthers, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-19 Cover Sheet Under Seal,
Att: 2 Exhibit 20 Debbie Weingarten, Its not fair, not right: how America treats its black farmers, The Guardian,
Att: 3 Exhibit 21-22 Cover Sheet Under Seal,
Att: 4 Exhibit 23 Mr. Provost emails multiple USDA officials re refusal to give a direct loan and discriminatory treatment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 24-53 Cover Sheet Under Seal,
Att: 6 Exhibit 54 Center for American Progress, Progressive Governance Can turn the Tide for Black Farmers,
Att: 7 Exhibit 55 Khalil Gibran Muhammad, The sugar that saturates the American diet has a barbaric history as the white gold that fueled slavery, The New York Times (Aug. 14, 2019),
Att: 8 Exhibit 56-69 Cover Sheet Under Seal,
Att: 9 Exhibit 70 OASCR acknowledgment of FOIA request,
Att: 10 Exhibit 71-72 Cover Sheet Under Seal,
Att: 11 Exhibit 73 OIG status update on FOIA request,
Att: 12 Exhibit 74 Cover Sheet Under Seal,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 14 Summons to T. Vilsack,
Att: 15 Summons to USDA,
Att: 16 Summons to US Attorney,
Att: 17 Summons to Attorney General