Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Michael G Gotsch, Sr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00275
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 02, 2024 11:07 PM EDT
Defendant
J. Galipeau
Defendant
Brandon Williams
Defendant
Cathy Weber
Defendant
Pleasant
Defendant
Motsagen
Defendant
Mooney
Defendant
Dorthy Livers
Defendant
Gary Lewis
Defendant
Dr. Jackson
Defendant
Indiana Department of Correction
Defendant
S.G.T Escobedo
Defendant
Tracy Cornett
Defendant
Nicole Bridegroom
Defendant
Michelle Boren
Defendant
Niraj Bhalakia
Defendant
Bell
Defendant
Baily
Defendant
Sandra Allen
Plaintiff
Ramel Theodore Troy
278678 Wabash Valley Correctional Facility - 1111 6908 S Old US Hwy 41
Carlisle, IN 47838


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order Striking Document Wed 04/02 4:42 PM
ORDER: The court STRIKES Troy's discovery requests34 ,35 ,36 , and37 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 04/02/2025. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
37 37 discov Request for Admissions Thu 03/27 3:19 PM
REQUEST for Admissions to MD James Jackson by Ramel Theodore Troy.(kmt)
Related: [-]
36 36 discov Request for Admissions Thu 03/27 3:18 PM
(Unsigned) REQUEST for Admissions to Sandra Allen by Ramel Theodore Troy.(kmt)
Related: [-]
35 35 discov Request for Admissions Thu 03/27 3:17 PM
REQUEST for Admissions to Nicole Bridegroom by Ramel Theodore Troy.(kmt)
Related: [-]
34 34 discov Request for Production of Documents Thu 03/27 3:16 PM
REQUEST for Production of Documents to Nicole Bridegroom by Ramel Theodore Troy.(kmt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/14 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David D Becsey on behalf of Sandra Allen, Nicole Bridegroom, Jackson, Dorthy Livers (Becsey, David)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/14 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roger K Kanne on behalf of Sandra Allen, Nicole Bridegroom, Jackson, Dorthy Livers (Kanne, Roger)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
31 31 misc Letter Tue 01/28 9:10 AM
Letter from Ramel Theodore Troy requesting copy of DE30 . Receipt SB 4627. Related [+] (ely)
Related: [-] quested copies sent
Thursday, January 02, 2025
30 30 misc Receipt Thu 01/02 5:20 PM
RECEIPT of Intentional Tort Claim from Ramel Theodore Troy.(nae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter regarding Tort Claim,
Att: 2 List of Attachments,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Envelope
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
29 29 misc Letter Thu 12/19 9:25 AM
Letter requesting copy of DE19 , received with $2.00 payment for copy, from Ramel Troy. (Copy and receipt sent to plaintiff) (nae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
28 28 misc Receipt Fri 11/15 11:28 AM
RECEIPT of Amended Complaint from Ramel Theodore Troy. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
27 27 misc Docket Annotation - public event with NEF Mon 08/05 11:04 AM
Copy of financial ledger (sent to WBV Inmate Trust Department). (nae)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
26 26 misc Letter Mon 08/05 11:03 AM
Letter from Ramel Troy requesting updated balance of filing fee be sent to Wabash Valley Inmate Trust Department. (Financial leger sent to WBV Inmate Trust Department) (nae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/02 11:56 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sandra Allen, Baily, Bell, Niraj Bhalakia, Michelle Boren, Nicole Bridegroom, Tracy Cornett, Escobedo, J. Galipeau, Jackson, Gary Lewis, Dorthy Livers, Mooney, Motsagen, Pleasant, Cathy Weber, Brandon Williams, filed by Ramel Theodore Troy.(kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Tue 07/16 3:15 PM
Letter from Ramel Theodore Troy requesting a Medical Review Panel. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
23 23 misc Docket Annotation - public event with NEF Tue 07/09 2:27 PM
Letter to be distributed to Ramel Theodore Troy #278678 in response to DE21 . (kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
22 22 misc Docket Annotation - public event with NEF Mon 07/08 3:14 PM
Docket sheet to be distributed to Ramel Theodore Troy #278678. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
21 21 misc Letter Mon 07/08 3:04 PM
Letter from Ramel Theodore Troy re: tort claim forms. Related [+] (kmt)
Related: [-] ceived without case number
20 20 misc Letter Mon 07/08 3:00 PM
Letter from Ramel Theodore Troy requesting status update. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
19 19 notice Notice - Other Mon 06/17 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Tort Claim by Ramel Theodore Troy (kmt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
18 18 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 06/12 6:12 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-11, this case is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi. Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr is no longer assigned to this case. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
17 17 misc Docket Annotation - public event with NEF Tue 05/21 4:56 PM
Copy of docket sheet to be distributed to Ramel Troy 278678 as requested in Letter DE16 . (nae)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
16 16 misc Letter Tue 05/21 4:55 PM
Letter from Ramel Troy requesting a docket sheet. (nae)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
15 15 misc Filing Fee Received Fri 05/17 4:20 PM
Initial Filing fee: $ 32.00, receipt number 2692. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
14 14 misc Docket Annotation - public event with NEF Wed 05/15 12:31 PM
In response to Letter DE13 ; no filing fee payments have been received as of 5/15/24. Copy of financial ledger attached. (nae)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Wed 05/15 12:29 PM
Letter from Ramel Troy re: filing fee payments. (nae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Striking Document Wed 05/08 3:35 PM
ORDER: The court STRIKES Troy's discovery requests10 ,11 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 05/08/2024. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
11 11 discov Request for Admissions Mon 05/06 3:49 PM
Plaintiff's Request for Admissions to Defendant Gary Lewis by Ramel Theodore Troy.(mrm)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Request for Production of Documents Mon 05/06 2:54 PM
Plaintiff Production Request to Defendant Gary Lewis by Ramel Theodore Troy.(eeb)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Mon 05/06 2:09 PM
ORDER DENYING8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Ramel Theodore Troy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/3/2024. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
8 8 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 04/30 3:42 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Ramel Theodore Troy.(mrm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, April 15, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Tue 04/16 4:52 PM
Letter from Ramel Troy received with $300 payment for copy of local rules. receipt number SB 3046 (Local rules sent) (nae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
6 6 misc Receipt Wed 04/10 5:02 PM
RECEIPT of Notice of Change of Address from Ramel Theodore Troy. (Current address already updated on docket)(nae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Information packet
5 5 misc Consent to Prisoner E-Service Wed 04/10 4:57 PM
Consent to Receipt of Documents Through Prisoner Electronic Filing Program by Ramel Theodore Troy. The Prisoner Electronic Filing Program operates pursuant to General Order 2018-1. When an inmate submits a document for electronic filing, the Prison Law Library emails a scanned copy and mails the original to the Court. The inmate should not mail a paper copy to the Court or a Defendant. When the scanned copy is docketed by the Court, a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) is emailed to the Prison Law Library. This NEF is printed by the Prison Law Library and given to the inmate with only the first page of the inmate's filing. Defendants are served by the Court. When the Prison Law Library receives an NEF for an entry by the Court, the NEF and a full copy of any attached order or document is printed and given to the inmate. The Prison Law Library will not print the NEF for documents filed by a Defendant. The Defendant must serve the inmate by mail. (nae)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/09 12:20 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDERS the plaintiff, Ramel Theodore Troy, IDOC # 278678, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $32.00 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee; ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Cristal C Brisco on 4/9/2024. (Copy mailed as directed in Order).(nhc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/01 3:06 PM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to close case, 1:24cv131 and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division with the same judges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/1/2024. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
**NEW CASE, PENDING MOTION** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. Case reassigned due to injunctive relief request contained in complaint. Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin no longer assigned to case. (sej)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Ramel Theodore Troy. (sej)
Related: [-]
1 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT (injunctive relief requested) with Jury Demand against Sandra Allen, Baily, Bell, Niraj Bhalakia, Michelle Boren, Nicole Bridegroom, Tracy Cornett, S.G.T Escobedo, J. Galipeau, Indiana Department of Correction, Dr. Jackson, Gary Lewis, Dorthy Livers, Mooney, Motsagen, Pleasant, Cathy Weber, Brandon Williams, filed by Ramel Theodore Troy. (File stamped copy and docket sheet mailed to Troy)(sej) Modified on 3/28/2024 to include injunctive relief request (sej).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-12,
Att: 3 Library Notice,
Att: 4 Envelope