Token Multi Services Corporation
Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher J Panos |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-10627 |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 30, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 11, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jun 14, 2024 |
Debtor
Token Multi Services Corporation
10 Mansfield Rd
Middleton, MA 01949-1515 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Assistant U.S. Trustee
Richard King - B
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109 |
|
Trustee
Gary W. Cruickshank
Law Office of Gary W.Cruickshank 21 Custom House Street Suite 920
Boston, MA 02110 |
Docket last updated: 04/03/2024 12:02 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
crditcrd
none
Tue 04/02 4:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-10627 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt Number A20419526, amount $ 338.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals All Schedules and Statements and Matrix. Filing Fee in the Amount of $338 Filed by Token Multi Services Corporation. (Butler, Joseph) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Signature Page filed by Debtor Token Multi Services Corporation (Butler, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Joseph G. Butler in the amount of $2750.00. Plus $338.00 paid to debtor`s counsel for court filing fees filed by Debtor Token Multi Services Corporation (Butler, Joseph) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Vote filed by Debtor Token Multi Services Corporation (Butler, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership (Rule 7007.1) filed by Debtor Token Multi Services Corporation (Butler, Joseph) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Meeting of Creditors scheduled on 4/30/2024 at 11:30 AM as a Telephonic Meeting. Government proof of claim due by 9/30/2024. Proofs of Claims due by 6/11/2024. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |