Garner et al v. Shine Solar, LLC et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05081 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 04, 2024 2:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Caleb Gorden
|
|
Defendant
Shine Solar, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Morgan Beard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bronson Curtis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allan Garner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/11 4:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Allan Garner, Bronson Curtis, Morgan Beard. Caleb Gorden was sent waiver on 4/9/2024, answer due 6/10/2024; Shine Solar, LLC was sent waiver on 4/9/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Short, Sean) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Thu 04/04 3:37 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/04 3:36 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Caleb Gorden, Shine Solar, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Thu 04/04 2:39 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Shine Solar and Caleb Gorden for service of the following document: 2 Complaint.(Short, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/04 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Caleb Gorden, Shine Solar, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-2955839), filed by Allan Garner, Bronson Curtis, Morgan Beard.(Short, Sean) (Main Document 2 replaced on 4/4/2024) (bjb) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/04 12:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Morgan Beard, Bronson Curtis, Allan Garner. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (ria) |