Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. SVG Contractors, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:24-mc-80083 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/22 11:11 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Northwest Administrators, Inc...(Holzhauser, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 04/12 11:26 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re:3 Affidavit of Service,, filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 04/11 12:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Ex Parte Application to Register Judgment from Another District; Civil & Discovery Referral Matters Standing Order Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen; Civil Pretrial Standing Order Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen; Settlement Conference Standing Order Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen; Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial; Blank Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction; ECF Registration Information; Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons; Waiver of the Service of Summons served on Shannon Quihley, Receptionist on 04/09/2024, filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc.. (Holzhauser, Catherine) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/08 9:14 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2024. (sfb, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Ex Parte Application (Miscellaneous Case Opening)
Fri 04/05 12:32 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION TO REGISTER JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT against SVG Contractors, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 52, receipt number ACANDC-19294946.). Filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc..(Holzhauser, Catherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Clerk's Certification of a Judgment to be Registered in Another District, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Judgment in a Civil Case, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service |