Johnson v. AY-GB Milpitas LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02082 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Santa Clara Superior Court, 24CV431084 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 2:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
AY-GB Milpitas LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aroma Coffee and Snack Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott Johnson
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/19 9:02 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by AY-GB Milpitas LLC.. (Alvarez, Christopher) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Fri 04/12 11:45 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by AY-GB Milpitas LLC. (Alvarez, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 04/11 11:51 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AY-GB Milpitas LLC re8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case, 7 Case Assigned by Intake,, (Alvarez, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 1:49 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Price, Dennis) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 04/08 3:42 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Aroma Coffee and Snack Corporation (Wiener, Seth) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/08 3:40 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aroma Coffee and Snack Corporation.. (Wiener, Seth) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Mon 04/08 2:29 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
respoth
Answer to Removal Complaint
Mon 04/08 2:22 PM
3 -Exhibit C Answer (with jury demand) to Removal Complaint by Aroma Coffee and Snack Corporation. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 04/05 2:45 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/19/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 04/05 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AY-GB Milpitas LLC re5 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Notice of Removal,4 Certificate of Interested Entities,2 Civil Cover Sheet,3 Declaration in Support (Alvarez, Christopher) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 04/05 2:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AY-GB Milpitas LLC (Alvarez, Christopher) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 04/05 2:11 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by AY-GB Milpitas LLC (Alvarez, Christopher) |
|
3 | 3
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Fri 04/05 2:09 PM
Declaration of Christopher S. Alvarez in Support of1 Notice of Removal filed byAY-GB Milpitas LLC. (Alvarez, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/05 2:07 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by AY-GB Milpitas LLC . (Alvarez, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/05 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV431084. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19295482). Filed by AY-GB Milpitas LLC. (Alvarez, Christopher) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 04/05 2:29 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . A copy of the state court pleadings being removed, including the defendants answer, and summons/process documents if filed in state court are required to process removals. Re:1 Notice of Removal filed by AY-GB Milpitas LLC (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
Remark
Fri 04/05 2:38 PM
REMARK - PER FILER COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO DECLARATION AS AN EXHIBIT. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |