California Plaza Owner, LLC v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as a Receiver for First Republic Bank
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Orrick |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02092 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 05, 2024 6:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as a Receiver for First Republic Bank
|
|
Plaintiff
California Plaza Owner, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/24 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Entry of12 Case Management Scheduling Order by California Plaza Owner, LLC (Wenger, Katherine) Modified on 4/24/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Tue 04/23 11:02 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2024 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2024. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/23/2024. (jmd, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/22 8:46 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on April 22, 2024.(cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 04/05 11:33 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by California Plaza Owner, LLC identifying Other Affiliate California Plaza Owner LLC, Other Affiliate Pacific Coast Capital Partners LLC, Other Affiliate Align California Plaza, LLC for California Plaza Owner, LLC. (Wenger, Katherine) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/05 5:30 PM
Proposed Summons. (Wenger, Katherine) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 04/05 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief; Breach of Lease; and Unlawful Takings Without Just Compensation against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as a Receiver for First Republic Bank ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19296736.). Filed by California Plaza Owner, LLC.(Wenger, Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |