Paradox Enterprises, LLC
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Nicholas W Whittenburg |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-10826 |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Paradox Enterprises, LLC
PO Box 235
Manchester, TN 37349-0235 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Historic U.S. Courthouse 31 E. Eleventh Street Fourth Floor
Chattanooga, TN 37402 |
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit
Wed 05/01 2:30 PM
Affidavit of: Gray Waldron Filed by Denis Graham Waldron on behalf of Debtor Paradox Enterprises, LLC . (Waldron, Denis) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/26 4:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Marvin E. Clements Jr. on behalf of Creditor TN Dept of Revenue. (Clements, Marvin) |
|
Sunday, April 14, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Mon 04/15 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 15. Notice Date 04/14/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
8
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 04/12 10:27 AM
Agreed Order granting motion on interim basis; final hearing scheduled 05/06/2024 at 10:30 AM at Second Floor Courtroom, U. S. Courthouse, Winchester, TN. . (tla) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 04/12 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 04/12 12:39 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 04/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
court
Hearing Held/Continued (BK)
Thu 04/11 10:09 AM
Hearing Held/Continued Motion granted on interim basis; final hearing scheduled 05/06/2024 at 10:30 AM at Second Floor Courtroom, U. S. Courthouse, Winchester, TN. Replacement order to be submitted. (sal) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 04/10 4:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Gregory C. Logue on behalf of Creditors Legalist DIP SPV II, LP, Legalist DIP Fund I, LP. (Logue, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Tue 04/09 1:34 PM
Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time. (tla) |
|
10 | 10
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Tue 04/09 7:05 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/10/2024 at 10:00 AM Second Floor Courtroom, U. S. Courthouse, Winchester, TN. Proof of Claim due by 8/5/2024. Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee. (Holesinger, David) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Employ
Mon 04/08 5:04 PM
Application to Employ Dunham Hildebrand, PLLC as Attorney Filed by Denis Graham Waldron on behalf of Debtor Paradox Enterprises, LLC Hearing scheduled 5/6/2024 at 09:30 AM at Second Floor Courtroom, U. S. Courthouse, Winchester, TN. (Waldron, Denis) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Mon 04/08 4:55 PM
Motion to Shorten Time To Notice Period for Expedited Motion for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral and (II) Granting Adequate Protection Filed by Denis Graham Waldron on behalf of Debtor Paradox Enterprises, LLC (Waldron, Denis) |
|
7 | 7
20
pgs
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Mon 04/08 4:35 PM
Expedited Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Grant Adequate Protection Filed by Denis Graham Waldron on behalf of Debtor Paradox Enterprises, LLC Hearing scheduled 4/11/2024 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Waldron, Denis) |
|
Saturday, April 06, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (generic)
Sat 04/06 1:11 AM
Notice of Filing - Debtor Profile Filed by Denis Graham Waldron on behalf of Debtor Paradox Enterprises, LLC. (Waldron, Denis) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Fri 04/05 11:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:4:24-bk-10826] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24057842. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Equity Security Holders
Fri 04/05 11:49 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Denis Graham Waldron on behalf of Debtor Paradox Enterprises, LLC. (Waldron, Denis) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Fri 04/05 11:48 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Denis Graham Waldron on behalf of Debtor Paradox Enterprises, LLC. (Waldron, Denis) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Debtor Electronic Noticing Election (DeBN)
Fri 04/05 11:48 PM
Debtor Declines Participation in Debtor Electronic Noticing Filed by Denis Graham Waldron on behalf of Debtor Paradox Enterprises, LLC. (Waldron, Denis) |
|
1 | 1
40
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 04/05 11:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Denis Graham Waldron on behalf of Paradox Enterprises, LLC. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/2/2024. (Waldron, Denis) |