Addisu v. Donis et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Tolliver Giles |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00560 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 11:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Antonio Donis
|
|
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
|
Plaintiff
Aster Addisu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 04/26 12:07 PM
ORDERED that the parties' motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until further order of this Court; and it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report with this Court thirty (30) days after Plaintiff's asylum interview dated June 26, 2024, and every thirty (30) days thereafter in re6 Joint Motion to Stay the Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 4/26/2024. (swil) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stay
Thu 04/25 2:51 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by Antonio Donis, Ur Mendoza Jaddou.(Cooper, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian James Cooper on behalf of Antonio Donis, Ur Mendoza Jaddou (Cooper, Christian) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 04/10 6:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aster Addisu. All Defendants. (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 04/09 9:35 AM
Summons Issued as to Antonio Donis, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(swil) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Notice | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/08 10:37 AM
Proposed Summons by Aster Addisu. (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 10:35 AM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9458846.), filed by Aster Addisu.(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Form I-589 Receipt Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 04/09 9:36 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (swil) |