Stochevski v. Weingarten et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Alex G Tse |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02096 |
Nature of Suit | 160 Contract - Stockholders’ Suits |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Delaware, 1:24-cv-00025 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 10:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Charlene T. Begley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Bernhardt
U.S. Department of the Interior 1849 C Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20240 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aaron Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark S. Peek
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ana Pinczuk
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Daniel Scheinman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SentinelOne, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teddie Wardi
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tomer Weingarten
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey W. Yabuki
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Stochevski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jay L. Pomerantz on behalf of Defendants Tomer Weingarten, David Bernhardt, Charlene T. Begley, Aaron Hughes, Mark S. Peek, Ana G. Pinczuk, Daniel Scheinman, Teddie Wardi, Jeffrey W. Yabuki, and Nominal Defendant SentinelOne, Inc. (Pomerantz, Jay) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/08 9:44 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 04/08 9:43 AM
Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:24-cv-00025. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 SO ORDERED Granting6 Stipulation and Proposed Order Transferring Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/4/2024. (nms) | |
6 | 6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Transferring Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), by Walter Stochevski. (Rigrodsky, Seth) Modified on 4/4/2024 (nms). | |
5 | 5 RESPONSE to 4 Oral Order to Show Cause, filed by Walter Stochevski.(Rigrodsky, Seth) Modified on 4/4/2024 (nms). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (nms) | ||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ORAL ORDER: The parties are requested to show cause why I should not transfer this case to the Northern District of California. Further, Plaintiff is directed to advise how many shares of SentinelOne, Inc. he owned during the relevant time period. Both submissions are due no later than April 5, 2024. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/22/2024. (nms) | |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Stay of Action by Walter Stochevski. (Rigrodsky, Seth) | |
Wednesday, January 17, 2024 | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) | ||
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mkr) | |
1 | 1 35 pgs COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Charlene T. Begley, David Bernhardt, Aaron Hughes, Mark S. Peek, Ana Pinczuk, and Daniel Scheinman (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4311914.) - filed by Walter Stochevski. (mkr) | |
Att: 1 Verification of Walter Stochevski, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
No Summons Issued. (mkr) |