Washington Western District Court
Judge:Barbara J Rothstein
Case #: 2:24-cv-00466
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 7:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Zeinab Birjandian
Defendant
Omid Mola
Plaintiff
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By
Andrew S Moses
Gordon & Polscer (or)
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds Tue 06/18 2:44 PM
ORDER granting Parties'8 Stipulated Motion for Disbursement of Funds and Interpleader Relief. Prudential is directed to distribute to Zeinab or, in the alternative, to the Clerk of the Court: a check in the amount of $10,000.00, representing the Life Death Benefit, together with applicable interest, if any; and a check in the amount of $23,700.00, representing the AD&D Death Benefit, together with applicable interest, if any; and in the event there is an election to deposit the funds with the Court, the Clerk is directed to deposit funds into the Registry of the Court in the principal amount of $33,700. Prudential is dismissed from this action, with prejudice, and all claims asserted or that could have been asserted herein against Prudential are dismissed with prejudice, and without fees or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
8 8 motion Disbursement of Funds Mon 06/17 3:55 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Disbursement of Funds and Interpleader Relief , filed by Plaintiff The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Noting Date 6/18/2024, (Moses, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 16, 2024
7 7 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Thu 05/16 7:45 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/13/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/20/2024, Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2024. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (NAW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Wed 05/15 12:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Zeinab Birjandian mailed on 4/11/2024 (Moses, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 04/15 9:00 AM
Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Omid Mola. (SB)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
4 4 misc Praecipe for a Summons Fri 04/12 11:32 AM
PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re1 Complaint, re Omid Mola, by Plaintiff The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Moses, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
3 3 misc BJR Standing Order (FORM) Tue 04/09 11:34 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. (NAW)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/09 11:08 AM
Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (KS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
2 2 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 04/08 10:16 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Moses, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 04/08 10:14 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Related [+] filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Moses, Andrew)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8421232
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet