Flournoy v. Wade
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Referred: | Pslc Llh |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02101 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 6:08 AM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-CDCR CUSTODY) - Re 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Henry Flournoy, Jr. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) and Prison Trust Account Modified on 4/17/2024 (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 04/17 6:07 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP
Mon 04/08 12:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Henry Flournoy, Jr. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 12:46 PM
COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Kathryn Wade Filed by James Henry Flournoy, Jr.(kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |