Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Robert D Mariani
Referred: Ca
Case #: 3:24-cv-00592
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
36 36 misc Document Filed Tue 04/15 11:17 AM
Defendants' Supplemental Information in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic.32 Order,,, . (Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 04/15 8:58 AM
ORDER DENYING24 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. If further proceedings demonstrate the need for counsel, the matter will be reconsidered either sua sponte or upon motion of Plaintiff. ** SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS ** Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/15/2025 (cac)
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Discovery Tue 04/15 8:56 AM
ORDER DENYING23 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. Plaintiffs request (Doc. 24) to extend the discovery deadlines is DENIED as he filed to establish good cause for modification of the Scheduling Order under Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/15/2025 (cac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
33 33 motion Compel Discovery Thu 04/03 12:04 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery (Entitled 'Motion for Default Judgment") by Michael Demuro-Correll.(ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/31 10:44 AM
ORDER re20 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1.Because Defendants raise the issue of whether Plaintiff exhausted his administrative remedies prior to initiation of this action as required by the Prison Litigation Reform Act, 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a), in accordance with Paladino, 885 F.3d 203 and Small v. Camden Cnty., 728 F.3d 265 (3d Cir. 2013), the Court is placing the parties on notice that it will consider exhaustion in its role as fact finder. 2. Within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order, the parties may supplement the record with any additional supporting evidence relevant to exhaustion of administrative remedies. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 3/31/2025. (cac)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
31 31 misc Exhibit Fri 11/15 10:32 AM
EXHIBITS filed by Michael Demuro-Correll. (ao)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Statement of Facts Fri 11/15 10:30 AM
COUNTER STATEMENT OF FACTS re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment,21 Statement of Facts filed by Michael Demuro-Correll.(ao)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
29 29 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 11/13 4:20 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re23 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Michael Demuro-Correll.(ao) (ao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/13/2024) Exhibit A
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
28 28 misc Letter Tue 11/05 10:19 AM
Letter dated 10/29/24 from Michael Demuro-Correll (ao)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Exhibit Tue 11/05 10:13 AM
EXHIBIT A by Michael Demuro-Correll re26 Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. (ao)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 11/05 10:09 AM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Demuro-Correll.(ao) (ao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/5/2024) Proposed Order
Thursday, October 24, 2024
25 25 misc Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Thu 10/24 7:47 AM
RESPONSE by Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic to23 MOTION to Compel Discovery . (Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 10/23 11:09 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to resolve discovery dispute by Michael Demuro-Correll.(ao)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Compel Discovery Wed 10/23 10:54 AM
MOTION to Compel Discovery by Michael Demuro-Correll.(ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
22 22 respm Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 10/21 7:30 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic.(Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Statement of Facts Mon 10/21 7:29 AM
STATEMENT OF FACTS re20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic.(Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
20 20 motion Summary Judgment Tue 10/08 5:47 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic.(Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 08, 2024
19 19 discov Request for Production of Documents Thu 08/08 11:59 AM
Combined Answer and REQUEST for Production of Documents and Things by Michael Demuro-Correll.(ao)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
18 18 misc Letter Mon 07/22 10:48 AM
Copy of Letter dated 7/16/2024 from Michael Demuro-Correll to Atty Geiger re: discovery; (ep)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
17 17 misc Request (Do not use if you are filing a motion or requesting default; see default events below) Fri 07/12 10:25 AM
REQUEST dtd 6/29/24 for copy of motions and reply by Michael Demuro-Correll. (ao)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 07/12 10:26 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Copy of docket sheet sent to Pltf with price per document. (ao)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/12 1:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/9/2024. On or before 9/23/24, the parties shall notify the Court of their willingness to consent to the jurisdiction of a US Mag Judge. Dispositive Motions due by 10/9/2024. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 6/12/24. (ao)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 06/12 1:26 PM
ORDER denying Pltf's8 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 6/12/24 (ao)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
14 14 respm Reply Brief Wed 05/15 9:40 AM
REPLY BRIEF re8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Michael Demuro-Correll.(cp)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/06 9:36 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic.(Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
12 12 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Fri 05/03 11:23 AM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic.(Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/02 3:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Correctional Officer Kubic, Warden Haidle. (Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 05/02 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Geiger on behalf of Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic (Geiger, Gerard)
Related: [-]
9 9 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Thu 05/02 10:39 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Michael Demuro-Correll.(cp)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appoint Counsel Thu 05/02 10:37 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael Demuro-Correll.(cp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
utility ADI Receipt Entry Tue 04/23 9:14 AM
Receipt of payment from DPAM324CV000592 in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee- Non-Prisoner. Transaction posted on 4/19/2024. Receipt number 333109500 processed by EP. (jjs)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Forms Sent (AO 398 and 399) to Defendants Mon 04/22 3:44 PM
Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic with copy Waiver Order and Complaint; Waiver of Service due by 5/22/2024. copy Waiver Order and Complaint also mailed to PA State Atty General; (ep)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Directing Clerk's Office to Send Waiver of Service Forms Mon 04/22 3:21 PM
ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/22/24. (ep)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
5 5 misc Filing Fee Received - Complaint is now deemed Filed Fri 04/19 2:23 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 333109500. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (cp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order - 30 Day Administrative Order Mon 04/08 2:52 PM
THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 04/08/2024.(lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP (civil rights)
3 3 misc Pro Se Letter Issued - DJ IS PRESIDING JUDGE Mon 04/08 2:48 PM
PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (lp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent,
Att: 2 Instruction Sheet,
Att: 3 Fed and Local Rules,
Att: 4 398 Forms,
Att: 5 399 Form
2 2 service AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff Mon 04/08 2:42 PM
AO 398 and AO 399 Waiver of Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (lp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/08 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Warden Haidle, Correctional Officer Kubic lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Michael Demuro-Correll.(lp)
Related: [-]