Entri LLC v. GoDaddy.com LLC
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Trenga |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00569 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 5:14 PM EDT |
Defendant
GoDaddy.com LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Entri LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Wed 04/17 11:01 AM
ORDERED that the Motions (Dkts. 5, 8) are GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the unredacted version of the Complaint filed under seal on April 9, 2024, shall remain sealed; and it is further ORDERED that, in the event the Clients become parties or material witnesses to this litigation, the Court will entertain a motion to unseal the unredacted version of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 4/17/2024. (Dest) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 04/17 1:12 PM
ORDER granting15 MOTION to Withdraw as counsel; and it is further ORDERED that John D. Perry and Mariam W. Trados shall deemed withdrawn as counsel for Entri. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick on 4/16/2024. (Dest) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 04/16 2:47 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Entri LLC.(Perry, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett Hooe on behalf of Entri LLC (Hooe, Garrett) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Giles on behalf of Entri LLC (Giles, Nicholas) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/15 12:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Entri LLC. GoDaddy.com LLC waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Perry, John) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Unredacted Document
Thu 04/11 9:12 PM
Unredacted Doument re1 Complaint by Entri LLC. (Perry, John) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 8:51 PM
Summons Issued as to GoDaddy.com LLC, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (Dest) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/11 9:35 AM
Proposed Summons by Entri LLC. (Perry, John) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Thu 04/11 8:49 PM
Notice of Correction re4 Unredacted Document. Unfortunately, the filing user's login does not match the signature on the document. The filing user must refile the document with the filing user's signature block, or the attorney whose signature block appears on the document must refile the document. (Dest) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Seal
Tue 04/09 5:51 PM
Amended MOTION to Seal by Entri LLC.(Perry, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C)
Tue 04/09 5:39 PM
Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Entri LLC re5 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint (Perry, John) |
|
6 | 6
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 04/09 5:34 PM
Memorandum in Support re5 MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint filed by Entri LLC. (Perry, John) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Seal
Tue 04/09 5:33 PM
MOTION to Seal Unredacted Complaint by Entri LLC. (Perry, John) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Unredacted Document
Tue 04/09 5:28 PM
Unredacted Document re1 Complaint by Entri LLC. (Perry, John) |
|
utility
Remark
Tue 04/09 5:07 PM
No service issued at this time. (Dest) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 8:08 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Entri LLC. (Perry, John) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 8:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John David Perry on behalf of Entri LLC (Perry, John) |
|
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 4:15 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9460288.), filed by Entri LLC.(Tadros, Mariam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 04/09 5:02 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Dest) |