Porter v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Christy D Comstock |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05084 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 10:16 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 9, 2024. (bjb) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Tue 04/09 8:25 AM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Ebony L. Porter. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Young, Kelsey) |
|
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Tue 04/09 10:18 AM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/8/2024, answer due 6/7/2024. (bjb) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Mon 04/08 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 4/22/2024.(bjb) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 4:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ebony L. Porter. (Young, Kelsey) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Ebony L. Porter.(Young, Kelsey) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 04/08 4:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ebony L. Porter. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (ria) |