Parks v. Taylor et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | P K Holmes III |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-02046 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 6:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
Wesley Beckham
|
|
Defendant
Jeremiah Corbitt
|
|
Defendant
Johnny Daniel Humphrey, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Judge Mike Medlock
|
|
Defendant
Savannah Scarberry
|
|
Defendant
Officer Shawn Taylor
|
|
Defendant
Officer Levi Townsend
|
|
Plaintiff
Kristopher Orion Parks
pattersonkris4@gmail.com 7517 Highway 215
Mulberry, AR 72947 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/22 10:11 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to1 Complaint against Savannah Scarberry, Mike Medlock, Wesley Beckham, Shawn Taylor, Johnny Daniel Humphrey, Jr, Jeremiah Corbitt, Levi Townsend, filed by Kristopher Orion Parks. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Kristopher Orion Parks.(jlm) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 04/15 1:07 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Kristopher Orion Parks. Objections to R&R due by 5/2/2024. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 15, 2024. (khf) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Mon 04/08 3:54 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tmc) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 3:50 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on April 8, 2024. (tmc) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Service Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/08 3:49 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and MOTION for Service by Kristopher Orion Parks. (tmc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Wesley Beckham, Jeremiah Corbitt, Johnny Daniel Humphrey, Jr, Mike Medlock, Savannah Scarberry, Shawn Taylor, and Levi Townsend, filed by Kristopher Orion Parks.(tmc) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Mon 04/08 3:51 PM
MOTION REFERRED to Honorable Mark E. Ford:2 MOTION for Service filed by Kristopher Orion Parks. Motion referred to Honorable Mark E. Ford.(tmc) |