N. v. Bright Heart Health, Inc. d/b/a Bright Heart Health
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Illston |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02112 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:10 PM PDT |
Defendant
Bright Heart Health, Inc. d/b/a Bright Heart Health
|
|
Plaintiff
S. N.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 04/22 2:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by S. N.. Service waived by Bright Heart Health, Inc. waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Parker, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/16 9:52 AM
Summons Issued as to Bright Heart Health, Inc.. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 04/15 3:32 PM
Proposed Summons. (Parker, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 04/09 9:24 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2024 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 04/09 8:57 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . [err102] A motion and proposed order to proceed as Doe or use of a pseudonym must be filed. Re: 1 Complaint filed by S. N. (anj, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/08 4:24 PM
Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/08 3:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Bright Heart Health, Inc. d/b/a Bright Heart Health ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19300547.). Filed by S. N..(Parker, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |