Ramirez De Portillo v. Metro Services Group
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02118 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 6:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
Metro Services Group
|
|
Plaintiff
Claudia Ramirez De Portillo
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 12:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Joshua Valle (Valle, Alex) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Thu 04/25 7:25 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 5/9/2024 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/24 4:59 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Metro Services Group.. (Huie, Dennis) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/11 11:42 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 04/10 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Metro Services Group (Huie, Dennis) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 04/10 2:48 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 4:08 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Metro Services Group . (Huie, Dennis) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 04/09 1:53 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Re-submit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 form which can be downloaded from https://cand.uscourts.gov/. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file Civil Cover Sheet in its entirety. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Metro Services Group (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/08 6:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is 23-606813. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19301179). Filed by Metro Services Group.(Huie, Dennis) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Defendant's Certification of Conflicts, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Appendix, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Part 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Part 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Part 3, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Part 4, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Part 5, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Part 6, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Part 7, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Part 8, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Part 9, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Part 10, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Part 11, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Part 12, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Part 13, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Part 14, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Part 15, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Part 16, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Part 17, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Part 18, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit Part 19, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit Part 20, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit Part 1 of Letter Exh., | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Part 2 of Letter Exh., | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Part 3 of Letter Exh., | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit Part 4 of Letter Exh., | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit Part 5 of Letter Exh. |