Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:24-cv-01477
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 07, 2024
Terminated:Mar 27, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Oct 05, 2024 8:48 AM EDT
Defendant
April Tinsley
Represented By
Raleigh Willis Rollins, Jr.
Alexander & Vann, LLP
contact info
Henry Thomas Shaw
Alexander & Vann, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sheriff Stephen B. Tinsley
Represented By
Emily Hancock
Brown, Readdick, Bumgartner, Carter, Strickland & Watkins
contact info
Richard Keith Strickland
Brown, Readdick, Bumgartner, Carter, Strickland & Watkins
contact info
Interested Party
Association County Commissioners Georgia - Interlocal Risk Management Agency ("ACCG-IRMA")
Plaintiff
Ashley Jackson
Represented By
Bakari T. Sellers
Strom Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Harry Martina Daniels
The Law Offices Of Harry M. Daniels, LLC
contact info
Latrice Latin Alexander
The Latin Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Darius Rice
Represented By
Bakari T. Sellers
Strom Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Harry Martina Daniels
The Law Offices Of Harry M. Daniels, LLC
contact info
Latrice Latin Alexander
The Latin Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 18, 2025
39 39 appeal USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal Fri 04/18 2:16 PM
USCA Clerk's Entry of Dismissal of Voluntary Dismissal: The consent motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal is GRANTED by clerk. Pursuant to FRAP 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a),27 Notice of Appeal was duly entered dismissed on this date. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit, Case Number 25-10651 GG. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
38 38 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/27 10:40 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion to Stay. In light of the stay, the Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case for docket management purposes. The Court will automatically reopen this case upon resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 3/27/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 03/27 10:41 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 03/24 10:17 AM
Submission of33 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeal , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
37 37 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Fri 03/21 11:20 AM
CORRECTED USCA Acknowledgment of27 Notice of Appeal, filed by Stephen B. Tinsley. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 25-10651 F. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
36 36 appeal Transcript Order Form Tue 03/18 12:10 AM
TRANSCRIPT Order Form (No Hearing) re:27 Notice of Appeal. (Hancock, Emily) Modified on 3/18/2025 to update text (pjm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/14 4:57 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re33 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeal filed by April Tinsley, Stephen B. Tinsley. (Hancock, Emily)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Sun 03/09 9:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re33 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeal filed by Ashley Jackson, Darius Rice. (Alexander, Latrice)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
order Order Fri 03/07 8:19 AM
ORDER: Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to respond to Defendants' Motion to Stay no later than close of business on Wednesday, March 12th. Defendants' reply shall be filed no later than close of business on Friday, March 14th. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 3/7/2025. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
33 33 motion Stay Thu 03/06 10:12 PM
MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Appeal with Brief In Support by April Tinsley, Stephen B. Tinsley.(Hancock, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Scheduling Order Wed 03/05 8:23 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:30 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 7/7/2025. Motions due by 8/6/2025. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 3/4/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
31 31 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Tue 03/04 8:23 AM
USCA Acknowledgment of27 Notice of Appeal, filed by Stephen B. Tinsley. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 25-10651 F. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
30 30 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 02/27 10:25 PM
Amended JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Ashley Jackson, Darius Rice. (Daniels, Harry)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 02/27 4:41 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Ashley Jackson, Darius Rice. (Alexander, Latrice)
Related: [-]
28 28 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Thu 02/27 3:01 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order, and Docket Sheet to USCA- 11th Circuit re:27 Notice of Appeal. There is no Transcript. Appeal fees have been paid on 2/27/25; Receipt# AGANDC-14104525. The District Judge is J. P. Boulee. (pjm)
Related: [-]
27 27 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 02/27 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to26 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, by Stephen B. Tinsley. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number AGANDC-14104525. Transcript Order Form due on 3/13/2025 (Strickland, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
26 26 22 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 02/13 10:48 AM
ORDER: To the extent that Sheriff Tinsley's Motion to Dismiss seeks dismissal of the excessive force claim and state law assault and battery claims against him, the Motion Doc.18 is DENIED. To the extent that the Operative Complaint contains a false arrest claim, Sheriff Tinsleys Motion is GRANTED. The parties are HEREBY ORDERED to file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, as required under Local Rule 16.2, no later than fourteen days from the date of this order. The parties are notified that a failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions, including dismissal. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/13/2025. (gww)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/12 4:04 PM
ORDER: In light of the12 Amended Complaint, the9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is terminated as MOOT. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 2/12/2025. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 08/20 9:39 AM
Clerk's Notation re23 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement,21 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement,22 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement: : Read and approved by District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 08/20 10:27 AM
Submission of18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/19 11:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephen B. Tinsley. (Hancock, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 08/14 2:42 PM
ORDER: The Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery Doc.19 is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pretrial and discovery deadlines are STAYED pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/14/2024. (gww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
23 23 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/13 5:10 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by April Tinsley identifying Other Affiliate ACCG-IRMA for April Tinsley. (Rollins, Raleigh)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 08/13 12:25 PM
Submission of19 MOTION to Stay , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
22 22 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/09 8:45 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Darius Rice. (Carey, Crystal)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/09 12:41 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stephen B. Tinsley. (Strickland, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 08/06 2:55 PM
ORDER: A review of the docket in this case shows that Plaintiffs and Defendants have not complied with Local Rule 3.3 of this Court requiring that a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement be filed at the time of the party's first appearance. LR 3.3A, NDGa. It is hereby ORDERED that parties file their Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, if applicable, within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to submit this matter to the undersigned in the event parties fail to file within this time frame. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on August 6, 2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 04, 2024
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Sun 08/04 4:45 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ashley Jackson, Darius Rice. (Daniels, Harry)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
19 19 motion Stay Fri 07/26 1:12 PM
MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Stephen B. Tinsley.(Hancock, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 07/23 11:58 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Stephen B. Tinsley.(Hancock, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 07/23 3:54 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by April Tinsley.(Rollins, Raleigh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Filing Wed 07/10 11:53 AM
NOTICE Of Manual Filing re12 Amended Complaint by Ashley Jackson, Darius Rice (gww) Modified on 7/10/2024 (gww)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 07/09 4:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pretrial and discovery deadlines are STAYED pending resolution of the9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/9/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Tue 07/09 9:36 AM
NOTICE Of Filing by Ashley Jackson, Darius Rice re12 Amended Complaint,, Exhibit A, video surveillance recording on April 7, 2022, of Mr. Tinsley body slamming a compliant and handcuffed Mr. Rice to the ground. (Daniels, Harry)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/09 9:30 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Response to Defendant Sheriff Stephen B. Tinsley's Motion to Dismiss filed by Ashley Jackson, Darius Rice. (Daniels, Harry)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/09 9:04 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against April Tinsley, Stephen B. Tinsleywith Jury Demand filed by Darius Rice, Ashley Jackson.(Daniels, Harry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, video surveillance recording on April 7, 2022, of Mr. Tinsley body slamming a compliant and handcuffed Mr. Rice to the ground.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
utility Remark Thu 07/11 4:15 PM
RECEIPT OF MANUAL FILING: 1USB received in Atlanta Division re16 NOTICE of Manual Filing. CD scanned by IT Department and placed in the receptacle for filing by the Records Department. (gww) Modified on 7/11/2024 (gww)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/08 11:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ashley Jackson, Darius Rice. (Daniels, Harry)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 07/08 12:18 PM
Submission of10 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss ,9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
10 10 motion Stay Fri 06/21 6:20 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Stephen B. Tinsley.(Hancock, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 06/18 10:55 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Stephen B. Tinsley.(Strickland, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Saturday, June 08, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Sat 06/08 9:24 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by April Tinsley. Discovery ends on 11/5/2024.(Shaw, Henry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/23 10:38 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephen B. Tinsley. (Strickland, Richard)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 20, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Sat 04/20 7:10 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Darius Rice, Ashley Jackson. April Tinsley waiver mailed on 4/16/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Daniels, Harry)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Sat 04/20 7:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Darius Rice, Ashley Jackson. Stephen B. Tinsley waiver mailed on 4/19/2024, answer due 6/18/2024. (Daniels, Harry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/09 3:07 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Darius Rice, Ashley Jackson.(Daniels, Harry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, April 08, 2024
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Mon 04/08 3:31 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on April 8, 2024. (jkl)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Letter re:83.1 Mon 04/08 3:27 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Bakari T. Sellers. Clerk to follow-up by 4/18/2024. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 07, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/08 11:29 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13343909) filed by Darius Rice, Ashley Jackson.(gww)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet