Mohamed Salih v. Mendoza Jaddou et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey S White |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02080 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 46:1156 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 8:08 PM PDT |
Defendant
Emilia Bardini
|
|
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
|
Plaintiff
Hana Mohamed Salih
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order
Wed 04/10 5:00 PM
Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (slh, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 12:38 PM
Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/09 3:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Hana Mohamed Salih.(Carr, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Form I-589 Receipt Notice | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 04/09 2:57 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] re:1 Complaint filed by Hana Mohamed Salih. Caption of Complaint does not match defendants named in ECF (complaint shows Donis and Jaddou). Please re-file correction. (slh, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/08 9:28 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Carr, Charles) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19295605). Filed by Hana Mohamed Salih.(Carr, Charles) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Form I-589 Receipt Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |