Truong v. GAF Energy, LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02087 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Apr 05, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Santa Clara Superior Court, 24CV431942 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 8:08 PM PDT |
Defendant
GAF Energy, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Don Truong
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 04/19 4:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING *AS MODIFIED* 13 STIPULATION TO SUBMIT PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS TO ARBITRATION AND STAY CIVIL ACTION. Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2024. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2024.. (crr, COURT STAFF) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 04/19 12:53 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS TO ARBITRATION AND STAY CIVIL ACTION filed by GAF Energy, LLC.(Patta Howard, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 04/17 2:10 PM
CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/davila-edward-j-ejd/] (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/17 1:24 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(sfb, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 04/17 1:02 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/17 12:45 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GAF Energy, LLC.. (Patta Howard, Rachel) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel A Patta Howard (Patta Howard, Rachel) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/08 4:45 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 04/08 2:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GAF Energy, LLC re4 Civil Cover Sheet,2 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Notice of Removal, 5 Case Assigned by Intake,,3 Certificate of Interested Entities (Kearnaghan, Jason) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 04/08 11:11 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Mon 04/08 4:35 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] Clerk's Notice to counsel Rachel P. Howard. The Notice of Removal shows a different address from what is appearing in your ECF profile. Please update your personal profile on ECF. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by GAF Energy, LLC (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 Civil Cover Sheet by GAF Energy, LLC . (Kearnaghan, Jason) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by GAF Energy, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Standard Building Solutions Inc. for GAF Energy, LLC. re1 Notice of Removal, (Kearnaghan, Jason) | |
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GAF Energy, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Standard Business Solution for GAF Energy, LLC. re1 Notice of Removal, (Kearnaghan, Jason) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV431942. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19296101). Filed by GAF Energy, LLC.(Kearnaghan, Jason) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Answer, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Lucy Zhao | ||
respoth
Answer to Removal Complaint
Mon 04/08 4:41 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint - Exhibit C documents 1-3, pages 1-14 by GAF Energy, LLC. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |