Florida Middle District Court
Judge:James S Moody, Jr
Referred: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Case #: 8:24-cv-00872
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Apr 09, 2024
Terminated:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Oct 06, 2024 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Select Rehabilitation, LLC
Represented By
Carrie B. Hoffman
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Alexis M. Jackson
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
David B. Goroff
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Debbie Herring
Represented By
Nikole Miller
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info
Amanda E. Heystek
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 03, 2025
39 39 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 01/03 7:46 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/02 12:42 PM
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 37 Notice of Settlement. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/2/2025. (SMB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of settlement Thu 11/07 3:52 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Debbie Herring (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
36 36 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/09 9:45 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Debbie Herring. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice of a Related Action Fri 08/09 9:43 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Debbie Herring. Related case(s): Yes (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
34 34 answer Answer to amended complaint Mon 08/05 5:55 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 21 Amended Complaint by Select Rehabilitation, LLC.(Hoffman, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
33 33 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 07/22 5:25 PM
ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 31 Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendant shall file its Answer within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/22/2024. (JG)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/22 10:37 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re31 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document filed by Debbie Herring. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 07/11 5:35 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury by Select Rehabilitation, LLC. (Hoffman, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
30 30 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/03 10:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury filed by Debbie Herring. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
29 29 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 06/26 10:28 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/16/2025; Dispositive motions due by 7/31/2025; Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, JANUARY 8, 2026, AT 10:00 A.M. in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. JURY TRIAL is set on the FEBRUARY 2026 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Conduct mediation hearing by 6/27/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/26/2024. (SMB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 06/25 10:20 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff's deadline to submit a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is extended to July 3, 2024. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/25/2024. (SMB)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 06/25 10:13 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury by Debbie Herring. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
26 26 misc Case Management Report Tue 06/18 4:31 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 06/12 9:40 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file the Case Management Report is extended to June 18, 2024. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/12/2024. (SMB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 06/11 5:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Debbie Herring. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
23 23 motion Dismiss Fri 06/07 3:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury by Select Rehabilitation, LLC. (Hoffman, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 25, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Sat 05/25 12:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss pursuant to the filing of the Amended Complaint 21 . Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 5/25/2024. (JG)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/24 3:29 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Select Rehabilitation, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Debbie Herring.(Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
20 20 minutes Status Conference Tue 05/21 3:33 PM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/21/2024. (DIGITAL) (JS)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/21 2:59 PM
ORDER setting IDEAL Program deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/21/2024. (BEE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion for Hearing / Conference Tue 05/14 4:18 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 Motion for IDEAL Case Management Conference: Videoconference set for 5/21/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. The court will send counsel an calendar entry containing a link to the videoconference information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/14/2024. (BEE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
17 17 motion Hearing / Conference Fri 05/10 4:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Case Management Conference re5 Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program by Debbie Herring. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
16 16 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/09 2:19 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Carrie Hoffman may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/9/2024. (CES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/08 4:23 PM
MOTION for Carrie Hoffman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22072191 for $150 by Select Rehabilitation, LLC. (Jackson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/06 10:20 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney David B. Goroff may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel submit their Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/6/2024. (CES)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 05/06 7:38 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Carrie B. Hoffman Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss Fri 05/03 4:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss each claim of Plaintiff Debbie Herring by Select Rehabilitation, LLC. (Jackson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 05/03 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Alexis M. Jackson on behalf of Select Rehabilitation, LLC. Lead Counsel: David B. Goroff. (Jackson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/03 12:20 PM
MOTION for David B. Goroff to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22055259 for $150 by Select Rehabilitation, LLC.(Jackson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of David Goroff,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing for David Goroff
9 9 notice Notice of appearance Fri 05/03 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis M. Jackson on behalf of Select Rehabilitation, LLC (Jackson, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
8 8 service Summons returned executed Wed 04/17 4:51 PM
RETURN of service executed on April 12, 2024 by Debbie Herring as to Select Rehabilitation, LLC. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/17 11:26 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Debbie Herring. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Proof of service Wed 04/17 11:21 AM
***INCORRECT EVENT CODE, COUNSEL TO REFILE AS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED*** PROOF of service by Debbie Herring (Heystek, Amanda) Modified on 4/17/2024 (LD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Thu 04/11 7:45 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (ABC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
4 4 service Summons issued Tue 04/09 3:08 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Select Rehabilitation, LLC. (CTR)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/09 2:15 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-872-JSM-AAS. (RLK)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 04/09 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amanda E. Heystek on behalf of Debbie Herring. Lead Counsel: Amanda E. Heystek. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/09 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT against Select Rehabilitation, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21961991) filed by Debbie Herring.(Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons