11
|
|
11
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 04/24 5:20 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Dan Redding. (Mendoza, Luz)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 04/17 8:08 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2024. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/17/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 1:50 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
|
8
|
|
8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 04/15 9:02 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (bxl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 04/10 9:16 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Eric Lamb. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 2:33 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Dan Redding.. (Mendoza, Luz)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/09 1:40 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 04/09 1:11 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by James E. Murray, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Dan Redding (Mendoza, Luz)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 04/09 1:10 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mendoza, Luz)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 1:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Eric Lamb ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19303338.). Filed by Dan Redding, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, James E. Murray, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Operating Engineers Local 3 Heavy And Highway Trust Fund, Operating Engineers And Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice And Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Operating Engineers Health And Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 Vacation, Holiday and Sick Pay Trust Fund.(Mendoza, Luz)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet
|