Klotz et al v. McAllister et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy L Brooks |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-03019 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 6:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
Erin McAllister
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joe McAllister
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patricia McAllister
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erich Klotz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Klotz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Fri 04/26 9:38 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 6/20/2024 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/31/2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 26, 2024. (slc) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Wed 04/10 8:35 AM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re2 Notice of Removal : $ 405, receipt number AARWDC-2958271.. (Wooten, Roger) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Tue 04/09 4:31 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (ria) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/09 4:20 PM
STATE COURT ANSWER to3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Erin McAllister, Joe McAllister, Patricia McAllister.(ria) |
|
3 | 3
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 4:13 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Erin McAllister, Joe McAllister, Patricia McAllister, filed by Kelly Klotz, Erich Klotz.(ria) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/09 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Carroll County, Arkansas, Civil Division, case number 08WCV 2024-26, filed by Joe McAllister, Patricia McAllister, Erin McAllister.(ria) |
|
Att: 1 - State Court documents | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 3:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Erin McAllister, Joe McAllister, Patricia McAllister. (ria) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Tue 04/09 4:24 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/11/2024 (ria) |
||
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to Local Counsel representing Defendant(s) in Removal Cases: The following attorney(s) listed on the State Court Complaint is/are not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas: Todd Wooten . An attorney can register for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to Local Rule 83.5 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures Manualfor Civil and Criminal Filings for further information. (ria) Modified on 4/9/2024 (ria). | ||
notice
Clerk's Notice to Counsel in Removal Cases
Tue 04/09 4:37 PM
TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to Local Counsel representing Defendant(s) in Removal Cases: The following attorney(s) listed on the State Court Complaint is/are not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas: Todd Wooten . An attorney can register for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to Local Rule 83.5 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures Manualfor Civil and Criminal Filings for further information. (ria) Modified on 4/9/2024 (ria) |