Petitte v. Loloft, Inc. et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | P K Holmes III |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-05085 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 09, 2024 6:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
Paola Ibarra
|
|
Defendant
Loloft, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Brendan Powell
|
|
Plaintiff
Craig Petitte
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Scheduling Order
Mon 04/29 1:30 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/5/2024. Jury Trial set for 3/3/2025 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.. Signed by Michelle McEntire, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 29, 2024. (mjm) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) Counterclaim
Mon 04/29 12:56 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Craig Petitte by Loloft, Inc..(Ritter, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 1:56 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Brendan Howell, Paola Ibarra, Loloft, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (ria) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Tue 04/09 4:27 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Loloft Inc., Brendan Howell, Paola Ibarra for service of the following document: 2 Complaint.(Burks, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Summons Paola Ibarra, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement Summons Brendan Howell | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 4:26 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-2958162), filed by Craig Petitte.(Burks, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/09 3:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Craig Petitte. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (ria) |