Fong v. The Sports Basement, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kandis A Westmore |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02116 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Case in other court: | San Francisco County Superior Court, CGC-24-612753 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 8:07 PM PDT |
Defendant
The Sports Basement, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheyenne Fong
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Mon 04/29 4:54 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byCheyenne Fong. (Petersen, Christopher) |
|
14 | 14
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 04/29 7:27 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/26 5:01 PM
NOTICE by Cheyenne Fong of Interested Parties (Petersen, Christopher) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/26 4:58 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cheyenne Fong.. (Petersen, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 04/23 4:19 PM
NOTICE by Cheyenne Fong of Withdrawal of Lawrence Beall as Counsel (Petersen, Christopher) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 04/19 10:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Kenneth Petersen (Petersen, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Errata
Tue 04/16 3:49 PM
ERRATA re6 Notice (Other) Notice Errata to Defendant's Notice of Related Case by The Sports Basement, Inc.. (Nakabayashi, Shannon) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/15 6:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Without Leave to Amend filed by The Sports Basement, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/6/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. Responses due by 4/29/2024. Replies due by 5/6/2024.(Nakabayashi, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Joyce Chan ISO Defendant The Sports Basement, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss | ||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/12 2:35 PM
NOTICE by The Sports Basement, Inc. of Related Case (Nakabayashi, Shannon) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 04/10 4:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Sports Basement, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,, (Nakabayashi, Shannon) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 04/09 2:51 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by The Sports Basement, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, (Nakabayashi, Shannon) |
|
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 04/09 12:59 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 04/09 11:39 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/23/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-612753. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19301277). Filed by The Sports Basement, Inc.(Nakabayashi, Shannon) Modified on 4/10/2024 (far, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of DECLARATION OF ERIC PROSNITZ, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet |