9
|
|
9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 04/24 1:15 PM
CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/28/2024. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/davila-edward-j-ejd/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/22 2:06 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(sfb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
|
7
|
|
7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 04/19 4:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/19 12:28 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Patrick James Brenan.. (Edelsberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Issued
Sun 04/14 10:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Silicon Valley Mechanical, Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Sun 04/14 10:32 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2024 09:30 AM. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 04/10 3:07 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 04/10 9:56 AM
Proposed Summons. (Edelsberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
63
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 9:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Silicon Valley Mechanical, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19306350.). Filed by Patrick James Brenan.(Edelsberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit A - Notice of Security Incident redacted
|