Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Case #: 1:24-cv-00447
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1442 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:May 20, 2024
Case in other court:DE Superior Court, N22L-09-00044 JRJ
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 4:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Fred Joseph Shear
3810 Golfview Drive
Newark, DE 19702
Plaintiff
Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By
Janet Z. Charlton
Mccabe Weisberg & Conway PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 20, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/20 12:28 PM
ORDER: The Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case (see Order for further details) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 5/20/2024. ***Copy mailed to Pro Se Defendant 5/20/2024*** (ceg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order - Non-Prisoner Pro Se IFP-Deficiency Fri 04/19 11:55 AM
ORDER: The defendant, Fred Joseph Shear, has filed this action without prepayment of the filing fee or a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The defendant shall within twenty-one days from the date of this order, either: (1) submit a long form (AO Form 239) application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs (in forma paperis), or (2) pay in full the $405.00 filing fee. Failure to timely comply with this order may result in dismissal of the case without prejudice. (*Notice of Compliance deadline set for 5/10/2024) . Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 4/19/2024. (mpb) Modified on 4/19/2024 (ceg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AO Form 239 - Long Form
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/17 1:16 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
3 3 misc Statement Tue 04/16 11:10 AM
Courtesy Copy of Non-Negotiable Notice of Acceptance sent to M. Kozikowski by Fred Joseph Shear.(smg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Wed 04/10 2:00 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/10 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Superior Court, Case Number N22L-09-044 JRJ - filed by Fred Joseph Shear (No IFP, No Fee Paid).(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E
utility Remark Wed 04/10 2:02 PM
Remark: Magistrate Consent Form, Acknowledgment of Magistrate Consent, and Privacy notice mailed to pro se filer (jfm)
Related: [-]