Brodsky v. Schmidt Baking Company, Inc.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Claude M Hilton |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00577 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disability (Public Accommodations) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Fairfax County General District Court, GV24001745-00 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 4:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Schmidt Baking Company, Inc.
601 South Caroline Street
Baltimore, MD 21231 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jay Brodsky
7911 Westpark Drive #1429
McLean, VA 22102 |
Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Wed 05/01 4:53 PM
Letter to the court. (dvanm) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
So Ordered
Mon 04/22 3:53 PM
So Ordered re5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Jay Brodsky. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 04/22/2024. (dvanm, ) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/18 4:16 PM
Set Deadline as to2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (triver) |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 04/19 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jay Brodsky(dvanm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Hearing Date
Wed 04/17 9:28 AM
Notice of Hearing Date for May 24, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. re3 Memorandum in Support,2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 04/17 8:46 AM
Notice of Correction re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or a Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 04/15 12:24 PM
Memorandum in Support re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Schmidt Baking Company, Inc.. |
|
2 | 2
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/15 12:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Schmidt Baking Company, Inc.. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 3:40 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9465267.), filed by Schmidt Baking Company, Inc.. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Errata 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 04/10 4:55 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, ) |