Vaughn v. The State of Arkansas / ADC
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Referred: | Barry A Bryant |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04030 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Thu 04/25 3:02 PM
AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against The State of Arkansas filed by Walter Earnest Vaughn, III. Related document:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Walter Earnest Vaughn, III.(mll) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order Directing Pleading to be Filed
Thu 04/11 3:50 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING that a 28 U.S.C. § 2254 Habeas Corpus form be filed no later than May 10, 2024. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 11, 2024.(mll) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Wed 04/10 3:07 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form.(mll) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 2:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter Earnest Vaughn, III. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(mll) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 04/10 2:52 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Walter Earnest Vaughn, III.(mll) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/10/2024) (mll) |