Queen v. Mooney
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Van Keulen |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02161 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Santa Clara County Superior Court, 24CH012359 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 10:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
LeShawn Mooney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bathsheba Shunquita Queen
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 04/26 3:34 PM
ORDER Granting 11 Motion to Amend in light of Defendant's 14 Statement of Non-Opposition. The Clerk shall revise Defendant's name on the electronic docket to include her middle name as follows: LeShawn Deserae Mooney. All future filings in this action bearing the case caption shall reflect this change as well. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on April 26, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
14 | 14
oth_sup
Statement of Non-Opposition
Fri 04/26 9:36 AM
Statement of Non-Opposition re11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,1 Notice of Removal, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,9 Certificate of Service,7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge,6 Order filed byLeShawn Mooney. (Mehta, Sapna) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Wed 04/24 8:54 AM
ORDER: By May 8, 2024, Defendant shall file a response to the 11 motion. If Defendant does not file a response or object to the motion by that date, the Court will grant the motion. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on April 24, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Tue 04/23 2:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING 7/10/24 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 7/9/24. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/24 is reset to 7/9/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 04/23 1:55 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,1 Notice of Removal, 2 Case Assigned by Intake,,9 Certificate of Service,7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge,6 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned,4 Certificate of Service,3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,5 Order of Recusal, filed by Bathsheba Shunquita Queen. Responses due by 5/7/2024. Replies due by 5/14/2024. (Queen, Bathsheba) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/23 12:54 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bathsheba Shunquita Queen.. (Queen, Bathsheba) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 04/18 2:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LeShawn Mooney re8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,7 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Mehta, Sapna) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 04/18 1:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LeShawn Mooney. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 5/6/2024. Replies due by 5/13/2024.(Mehta, Sapna) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/18 1:32 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LeShawn Mooney.. (Mehta, Sapna) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 3:21 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (sfb, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Mon 04/15 1:53 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 4/15/2024. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 04/11 5:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LeShawn Mooney re1 Notice of Removal, (Mehta, Sapna) |
|
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/11 1:40 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2024 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Telephonic Only. (jml, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Thu 04/11 10:53 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2024. (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CH012359. (FEE WAIVED). Filed by LeShawn Mooney.(Mehta, Sapna) Modified on 4/11/2024 (wsm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |