DEVLIN v. Wormuth
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Claude M Hilton |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00592 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
HON Christine E Wormuth
101 ARMY PENTAGON
WASHINGTON, DC 20310 |
|
Plaintiff
MAXWELL A DEVLIN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 04/17 7:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maxwell A. Devlin. Christine E. Wormuth served on 4/16/2024, answer due 6/17/2024.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 04/15 12:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Christine E. Wormuth, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Dest) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/11 1:22 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by MAXWELL A DEVLIN.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 1:20 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9467231.), filed by MAXWELL A DEVLIN.(Pristera, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 04/15 12:22 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Dest) |