Brown v. United Healthcare Corporation
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-06050 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 15, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Ouachita County, 52CV-24-00044 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 2:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
United Healthcare Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janice Brown
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Transferring Case Out - Division
Mon 04/15 2:46 PM
ORDER Transferring Case to the El Dorado Division, Case No. 1:24-cv-1025. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 15, 2024. (jlm) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Submitted
Fri 04/12 8:43 AM
Notice of Removal filing fee paid re2 Notice of Removal : $ 405, receipt number AARWDC-2959883.. (McKinney, Don) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Thu 04/11 11:36 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 11:35 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against United Healthcare Corporation, filed by Janice Brown.(jlm) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Ouachita, case number 52CV-24-44., filed by United Healthcare Corporation.(jlm) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 11:32 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by United Healthcare Corporation. (jlm) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Thu 04/11 11:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $405.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days. If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/15/2024 (jlm) |