Taylor v. Uber Technologies Inc et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Alex G Tse |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02164 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 12:08 PM PDT |
Defendant
Checkr Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rasier LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Adam Taylor
4580 Rock Creek Circle
Trussville, AL 35173 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/15 11:33 AM
Summons Issued as to Checkr Inc., Rasier LLC, Uber Technologies Inc.(cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 US Marshal Form, | ||
Att: 2 US Marshal Form, | ||
Att: 3 US Marshal Form | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Mon 04/15 9:58 AM
ORDER Granting Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 4 Motion. (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/15 9:53 AM
ORDER Granting IFP Application by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 2 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Permission for Electronic Case Filing
Thu 04/11 11:55 AM
MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Adam Taylor.(cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/11 11:54 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 11:52 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Adam Taylor. (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Checkr Inc., Rasier LLC, Uber Technologies Inc. Filed by Adam Taylor. Consent/Declination due by 4/25/2024.(cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit |