Archer v. Citizens and Farmers Bank
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Roderick C Young |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00267 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 6:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Citizens and Farmers Bank
|
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Archer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Sunday, April 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Sun 04/28 10:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patricia Archer Citizens and Farmers Bank served on 4/17/2024, answer due 5/8/2024 (Munro, Devon) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Wed 04/24 9:30 AM
Notice of Correction re ECF5 - Improper filing event used. Filing attorney notified that proper filing event for summons returned executed can be found under service of process. When the correct event is used, it will prompt an answer due date . Please refile the document using the correct docket event - Summons Returned Executed. When refiling the document, please ensure that the original summons page signed by the clerk is the first document to appear followed by any documents regarding proof of service. (adun, ) |
||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 04/23 11:33 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Jason Long, Citizens and Farmers Bank on 4/17/2024, filed by Patricia Archer. (Munro, Devon) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 1:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Citizens and Farmers Bank. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jsmi, ) |
|
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/12 1:00 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (jsmi, ) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Thu 04/11 6:14 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Patricia Archer. (Munro, Devon) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/11 6:11 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint by Patricia Archer. (Munro, Devon) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 5:57 PM
Complaint (Class Action) ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9468490.), filed by Patricia Archer.(Munro, Devon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |