Baisden et al v. Life Line Screening of America Ltd et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William Alsup |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02173 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 4:08 PM PDT |
Defendant
Life Line Screening of America Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric McGrath
|
|
Plaintiff
Tynia Baisden
|
|
Plaintiff
Fantasia Hilliard
|
|
Plaintiff
Alona Jennings
|
|
Plaintiff
Jason Kirschner
|
|
Plaintiff
Dorian Medina
|
|
Plaintiff
Brinda Moore
|
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Powers
|
|
Plaintiff
Cecilia Smith
|
|
Plaintiff
Carmen Soriano
|
|
Plaintiff
Carllie Juanita Williams
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 04/16 11:34 AM
STIPULATION Pursuant to Local Rule 6.1 to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint to Allow Time for Court to Rule on Motion to Remand filed by Life Line Screening of America Ltd. (Scheithauer, Christopher) Modified text on 4/16/2024 (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/12 2:11 PM
NOTICE by Life Line Screening of America Ltd re1 Notice of Removal,, (Scheithauer, Christopher) |
|
7 | 7
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Fri 04/12 2:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Life Line Screening of America Ltd re1 Notice of Removal,, (Scheithauer, Christopher) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Fri 04/12 1:46 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Life Line Screening of America Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Life Line Screening Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Life Line Health Intermediate, Inc., Corporate Parent Life Line Health, Inc. for Life Line Screening of America Ltd. (Scheithauer, Christopher) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 04/12 10:01 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor.(dhm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 04/12 8:45 AM
Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (krp, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 04/12 10:46 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Please re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.*** Re:3 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Life Line Screening of America Ltd (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Thu 04/11 3:44 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Life Line Screening of America Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Life Line Screening Holdings, LLC for Life Line Screening of America Ltd. (Scheithauer, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 04/11 3:36 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Life Line Screening of America Ltd . (Scheithauer, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CV0002159. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19312916). Filed by Life Line Screening of America Ltd.(Scheithauer, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Service of Process Receipt, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 ADR Info., | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Notice of Judicial Assignment, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Notice of Case Management Conference, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Proof of Service of Summons |