Eisner v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Referred: | Peter H Kang |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02175 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 4:01 AM PDT |
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Zuckerberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matt Eisner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 04/29 5:40 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Matt Eisner. Responses due by 5/3/2024.(Bottini, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Francis A. Bottini, Jr., | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
28 | 28
4
pgs
order
Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Mon 04/29 11:53 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang denying 11 Administrative Motion to Shorten Time.(phklc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order
Fri 04/26 1:39 PM
[IN-CHAMBERS TEXT ONLY ORDER]: This case has been referred to the undersigned for discovery. See Dkt.13 . Accordingly, the Parties shall review and comply with this Court's Standing Order for Discovery, particularly Section H relating to discovery disputes, which is now applicable to this case. Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on 04/26/24. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phklc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/25 10:35 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Matt Eisner. Service waived by Mark Zuckerberg waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Bottini, Francis) |
|
25 | 25
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 04/25 10:30 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Matt Eisner. Service waived by Meta Platforms, Inc. waiver sent on 4/18/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Bottini, Francis) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 10:46 AM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Chui-Lai Cheung. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 10:43 AM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Nikolaus J. Williams. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 10:39 AM
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice, Charles S. Duggan. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 04/24 8:18 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Matt Eisner (Bottini, Francis) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Tue 04/23 7:58 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Shorten Time filed byMeta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Potischman, Neal) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of C. Duggan | ||
19 | 19
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 3:32 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19348342.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Cheung, Chui-Lai) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
18 | 18
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 3:30 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19348320.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Williams, Nikolaus) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
17 | 17
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/23 3:27 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19348297.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Duggan, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
16 | 16
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 04/23 3:19 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Potischman, Neal) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 04/23 3:18 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Potischman, Neal) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/23 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery
Mon 04/22 12:12 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/22/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
12 | 12
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Mon 04/22 10:01 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION for Preliminary Injunction hearing set for May 24, 2024 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) . Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/crb] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at crbcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than June 18, 2024 at 3:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
Fri 04/19 7:34 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Matt Eisner. Responses due by 4/23/2024.(Bottini, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Francis A. Bottini, Jr., | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
10 | 10
motion
Discovery
Fri 04/19 7:31 PM
MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery filed by Matt Eisner. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/3/2024. Replies due by 5/10/2024.(Bottini, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
9 | 9
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Fri 04/19 7:19 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Matt Eisner. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/3/2024. Replies due by 5/10/2024.(Bottini, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Francis A. Bottini, Jr. with Exhibits 1-6, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Wed 04/17 12:28 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/26/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/2/2024 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco - To be determined. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/16 1:40 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/16/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Mon 04/15 12:18 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/4/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2024 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 04/12 3:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/12 1:49 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matt Eisner.. (Bottini, Francis) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 04/12 11:09 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/11 4:28 PM
Proposed Summons. (Bottini, Francis) |
|
1 | 1
45
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number BCANDC-19313330.). Filed by Matt Eisner.(Bottini, Francis) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |