Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC v. Stuart Road Corporation et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth W Hanes |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00239 |
Nature of Suit | 196 Contract - Franchise |
Cause | 18:1831 Defense of Trade Secrets Act (DTSA) |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Brent Berridge
|
|
Defendant
Stuart Road Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Wed 04/24 1:02 PM
Letter from Kaufman & Canoles containing flash drive. (mrees) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit
Tue 04/23 5:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC by Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC.(Burch, Kristan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit
Tue 04/23 5:05 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Kristan B. Burch by Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC.(Burch, Kristan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit
Tue 04/23 5:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Texas Investigative Network, Inc. by Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC.(Burch, Kristan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
7 | 7
24
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 04/23 4:59 PM
Memorandum in Support re6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC. (Burch, Kristan) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 04/23 4:58 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC. (Burch, Kristan) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/12 10:50 AM
Two (2) Summonses Issued as to Brent Berridge, Stuart Road Corporation, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 10:16 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC. (Burch, Kristan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/11 10:15 PM
Proposed Summons for Brent Berridge by Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC. (Burch, Kristan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 04/11 10:14 PM
Proposed Summons for Stuart Road Corporation by Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC. (Burch, Kristan) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 10:12 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9468612.), filed by Pool Scouts Franchising, LLC.(Burch, Kristan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/12 10:43 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) |