CSC Leasing Co. v. Alladapt Immunotherapeutics, Inc.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry E Hudson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00268 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Alladapt Immunotherapeutics, Inc.
650 Live Oak Avenue Suite 200
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Plaintiff
CSC Leasing Co.
6802 Paragon Place Suite 350
Richmond, VA 23230 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/22 3:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by CSC Leasing Co. All Defendants (Donaldson, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/17 9:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Alladapt Immunotherapeutics, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jsmi, ) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 1:43 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by CSC Leasing Co.. (Donaldson, James) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 04/12 4:18 PM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,, by CSC Leasing Co.. (Donaldson, James) |
|
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 04/12 2:08 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (Kski, ) |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Fri 04/12 2:09 PM
Filing attorney reminded to file proposed summons as soon as possible. (Kski, ) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 10:18 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9468611.), filed by CSC Leasing Co..(Donaldson, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Master Lease, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Schedule D, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Schedule J, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Schedule K, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - DJK Acc. Certs., | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - EPA, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Schedule D Req., | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Schedule Exec. Req., | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Schedule H Req., | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Schedule Default Not., | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Accel. Not., | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Alladapt Resp., | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - CSC Adeq. Assur. Req., | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Alladapt 3.19 Resp., | ||
Att: 15 Civil Cover Sheet |