Penngrath v. O'Malley
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James Donato |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02177 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Social Security Procedural Order
Fri 04/26 2:08 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 04/26 10:41 AM
Case assigned to Judge James Donato. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/25 1:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Arthur Penngrath. (Waggoner, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 04/23 10:34 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filing fee not paid. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > Other Documents > New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Re:1 Complaint filed by Arthur Penngrath (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Fri 04/12 11:19 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Please file in forma pauperis. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Complaint filed by Arthur Penngrath (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 10:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley. Filed by Arthur Penngrath.(Waggoner, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |