Singh v. Jonas et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Kandis A Westmore |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-02162 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 12, 2024 1:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Deepika Padukone
|
|
Defendant
Kareena Kapoor Khan
|
|
Defendant
Saif Ali Khan
|
|
Defendant
Salman Khan
|
|
Defendant
Zareen Khan
|
|
Defendant
Virat Kohli
|
|
Defendant
Akshay Kumar
|
|
Defendant
Sidharth Malhotra
|
|
Defendant
Sargun Mehta
|
|
Defendant
Gauhar Khan
|
|
Defendant
Disha Patani
|
|
Defendant
Rakul Preet
|
|
Defendant
Mouni Roy
|
|
Defendant
Aisha Sharma
|
|
Defendant
Anushka Sharma
|
|
Defendant
Neha Sharma
|
|
Defendant
Tiger Shroff
|
|
Defendant
Ranveer Singh
|
|
Defendant
Diljit Dosanjh
|
|
Defendant
John Abraham
|
|
Defendant
Kiara Advani
|
|
Defendant
Mishaal Advani
|
|
Defendant
Nidhi Agrewal
|
|
Defendant
Jaswinder Singh Bains
|
|
Defendant
Alia Bhatt
|
|
Defendant
Sonal Chauhan
|
|
Defendant
Parineeti Chopra
|
|
Defendant
Avneet Kaur
|
|
Defendant
Ravi Dubey
|
|
Defendant
Shehnaz Gill
|
|
Defendant
Gippy Grewal
|
|
Defendant
Priyanka Chopra Jonas
|
|
Defendant
Katrina Kaif
|
|
Defendant
Neha Kakkar
|
|
Defendant
Anil Kapoor
|
|
Defendant
Ranbir Kapoor
|
|
Plaintiff
Gurpreet Singh
2864 Hilltop Mall Road
Richmond, CA 94806 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Report and Recommendations Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/18 3:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION; ORDER REASSINGING CASE TO DISTRICT JUDGE; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT re 1 2 , Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/18/2024. Objections due by 5/2/2024. (wft, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Thu 04/11 3:20 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2024, 01:30 PM in Oakland - Videoconference Only. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 3:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gurpreet Singh. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 3:15 PM
COMPLAINT (with jury demand) (no process) against John Abraham, Kiara Advani, Mishaal Advani, Nidhi Agrewal, Jaswinder Singh Bains, Alia Bhatt, Sonal Chauhan, Parineeti Chopra, Diljit Dosanjh, Ravi Dubey, Shehnaz Gill, Gippy Grewal, Priyanka Chopra Jonas, Katrina Kaif, Neha Kakkar, Anil Kapoor, Ranbir Kapoor, Avneet Kaur, Gauhar Khan, Kareena Kapoor Khan, Saif Ali Khan, Salman Khan, Zareen Khan, Virat Kohli, Akshay Kumar, Sidharth Malhotra, Sargun Mehta, Deepika Padukone, Disha Patani, Rakul Preet, Mouni Roy, Aisha Sharma, Anushka Sharma, Neha Sharma, Tiger Shroff, Ranveer Singh. Filed by Gurpreet Singh. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2024.(kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |